Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandr
Case #: 2:24-cv-01876
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332(d)(5)(B) Diversity of Citizenship under CAFA
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 5:36 AM EDT
Consol Plaintiff
SOPHIE CAHEN VORBURGER
Represented By
BART D. COHEN
Bailey & Glasser LLP
contact info
Defendant
FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL G. MENKOWITZ
Fox, Rothschild, O'Brien & Frankel
contact info
Nathalie Anne Freeman
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
EDWARD J. MCANDREW
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Intervenor
Dustin Busby
Represented By
JOHN A. YANCHUNIS
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
KEVIN CLANCY BOYLAN
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON DOZAL
Represented By
BART D. COHEN
Bailey & Glasser LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TALEYIA WILLIAMS
Represented By
PAUL COSTA
Fine, Kaplan & Black, Rpc
contact info
Plaintiff
GRIFFIN R. WAGNER
Represented By
RANDI KASSAN
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman
contact info
Plaintiff
SOPHIE CAHEN VORBURGER
Represented By
BART D. COHEN
Bailey & Glasser LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DERRICK VINES
Represented By
LIBERATO P. VERDERAME
Liberato P. Verderame
contact info
MARC H. EDELSON
Edelson Lechtzin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Stallone
Represented By
Jeff Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostro PA
contact info
KENNETH J. GRUNFELD
Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert
contact info
KRISTEN LAKE CARDOSO
Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia Soto
Represented By
Bryan Paul Thompson
Chicago Consumer Law Center, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ONIEQUE MORGAN
Represented By
GARY F. LYNCH
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DANA KERR
Represented By
GARY F. LYNCH
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
JEFFREY S. GOLDENBERG
Goldenberg Schneider Lpa
contact info
Jennifer M French
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
BART D. COHEN
Bailey & Glasser LLP
contact info
CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info
Plaintiff
Mickey Hwang
Represented By
Andrea Bonner
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
SAMANTHA E. HOLBROOK
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEROME FRASIER
Represented By
Vincent A. Coppola
Pribanic & Pribanic
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Courtney
Represented By
Ethen Ostroff
Ethen Ostroff Law
contact info
Plaintiff
ALISON CROTEAU
Represented By
NICHOLAS SANDERCOCK
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dustin Busby
Represented By
JOHN A. YANCHUNIS
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
KEVIN CLANCY BOYLAN
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
KATHERINE M. AIZPURU
Tycko & Zavareei LLP
contact info
RONALD PODOLNY
Morgan & Morgan Mass Tort Dept.
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN BROOKS
Represented By
AMANDA BROOKE MURPHY
Murphy Law Firm
contact info
KELLY K. IVERSON
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSE R APTHROP
25 FRANKLIN STREET
CORRY, PA 16407
Represented By
PATRICK HOWARD
Saltz Mongeluzzi Barrett & Bendesky
contact info
Plaintiff
MARC REICHBART
Represented By
Jeff Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostro PA
contact info
MELISSA CLARK
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info
KRISTEN LAKE CARDOSO
Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert
contact info
Mariya Weekes
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
ANDREW FERICH
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info
GARY M. KLINGER
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
51 51 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/01 3:26 PM
ORDER THAT A VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/5/2025 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/1/25. 5/1/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
50 50 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 04/30 3:38 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18255380.) filed by FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC...(BORON, JUSTIN)
Related: [-]