Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-cv-01876

Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandr
Case #: 2:24-cv-05420
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332(d)(5)(B) Diversity of Citizenship under CAFA
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
MERRICK BANK
Represented By
Andrew Albero
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Christopher Wood
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC.
Plaintiff
MARK CAPOZZI
Represented By
ANDREW FERICH
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info
Nicholas Elia
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info
CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
19 19 respoth Response Fri 04/11 6:16 PM
Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Deadlines by MERRICK BANK. (Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 20, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/21 9:21 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY ALL DEADLINES IN THIS CASE AND THE RELATED CASES ARE STAYED UNTIL THIS COURT RULES ON THE POTENTIAL CONSOLIDATION ISSUE OUTLINED IN THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED 2/27/25. THE CERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THIS ORDER IN ALL RELATED CASES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/20/25.3/21/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 03/17 9:19 AM
ORDER GRANTING12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHRISTOPHER WOOD. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/14/25. 3/17/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
16 16 respoth Response Fri 03/14 4:45 PM
Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Deadlines by MERRICK BANK. (Albero, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/28 11:10 AM
ORDER THAT A RULE IS HEREBY ISSUED FOR THE PARTIES TO ADDRESS A POTENTIAL CONSOLIDATION ISSUE NOTED IN THE STATUS REPORT. INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS SHOULD PURSUE ACTIONS AGAINST FBCS AND FBCS CUSTOMERS IN SEPARATE ACTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/27/25. 2/27/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/11 10:05 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY, DEFENDANT MAY ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT BY NO LATER THAN 3/31/25. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/10/25.2/11/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/10 12:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by MERRICK BANK.Certificate of Service.(Albero, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
12 12 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 02/05 10:45 AM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Wood, Esq. by MERRICK BANK. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18054058.).(Albero, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sponsor Statement,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 10:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARK CAPOZZI. (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 01/28 4:09 PM
Summons Issued as to FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 1/28/25. (va)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/28 10:48 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against MERRICK BANK, FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC., filed by MARK CAPOZZI.(FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Elia on behalf of MARK CAPOZZI with Certificate of Service(Elia, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES E. SCHAFFER on behalf of MARK CAPOZZI with Certificate of Service(SCHAFFER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/14 4:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING4 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER BY 2/22/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/14/25. 1/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 01/10 4:02 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cardworks Inc. by MERRICK BANK.(Albero, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/10 2:53 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Class Action Complaint filed by MERRICK BANK.Certificate of Service.(Albero, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Mon 01/06 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jordan Jacobson re: served Summons/Complaint/Civil Coversheet/Designation Form (SOP re: Merrick Bank) upon Dani Snow (Authorized Person) on January 2, 2025 (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to MERRICK BANK. Forwarded To: Counsel on October 10, 2024 (dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 10/09 10:46 PM
COMPLAINT against MERRICK BANK ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17802173.), filed by MARK CAPOZZI.(FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form