Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:24-bk-12327
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Finest Coachbuilding Group LLC
3161 Red Hill Ave
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
Represented By
Mark W. Eckard
Raines Feldman Littrell, LLP
contact info
Mark Melickian
Raines Feldman Littrell LLP
contact info
Robert S. Marticello
Raines Feldman Littrell LLP
contact info
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Raines Feldman Littrell LLP
contact info
Michael L Simon
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 9:26 PM EDT
Attorney
Raines Feldman Littrell LLP
824 North Market Street Suite 805
Wilmington, DE 19801
Creditor
AmTrust North America, Inc. on behalf of Technology Insurance Company, Inc.
23611 Chagrin Blvd. Suite 207
Beachwood, OH 44122
Represented By
Alan C. Hochheiser
Maurice Wutscher LLP
contact info
Creditor
d/b/a Pat Velasco Velasco, Pastor
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Schlerf
Stinson LLP
contact info
Benjamin J. Court
Stinson LLP
contact info
Kevin Kitchen
Stinson LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Jenson Button
Represented By
Brian Robert Lemon
Akerman LLP
contact info
Eyal Berger
Akerman LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Karen Dickens
Represented By
Brian Robert Lemon
Akerman LLP
contact info
Eyal Berger
Akerman LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Aaron Shelby
Represented By
Brian Robert Lemon
Akerman LLP
contact info
Eyal Berger
Akerman LLP
contact info
Trustee
Jeffrey E Schwendeman
Rpa Advisors 45 Eisenhower Drive Suite 560
Paramus, NJ 07652
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Hannah J McCollum
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
125 125 misc Certificate of No Objection Thu 05/01 3:42 PM
Certificate of No Objection Filed by Jeffrey E Schwendeman. (Schwendeman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order - Second Interim Fee Application
124 124 misc Certificate of No Objection Thu 05/01 3:38 PM
Certificate of No Objection Filed by Jeffrey E Schwendeman. (Schwendeman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 re Order - First Interim Fee Application
123 123 2 pgs answer Response Thu 05/01 2:36 PM
Response to Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to a Case Under Chapter 7 Related [+] Filed by d/b/a Pat Velasco Velasco, Pastor (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 120
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
122 122 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 11:23 AM
Certificate of Service re: Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to a Case Under Chapter 7 Related [+] Filed by Finest Coachbuilding Group LLC. (Eckard, Mark)
Related: [-] 120
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, April 24, 2025
121 121 crditcrd none Thu 04/24 8:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Convert Case 11 to Chapter 7 (B)([LINK 24-12327 TMH] ) [motion,mcn11to7] ( 15.00). Receipt Number A12143869, amount $ 15.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
120 120 9 pgs motion Convert Case 11 to 7 - Motion Thu 04/24 8:11 PM
Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to a Case Under Chapter 7. Fee Amount $15. Filed by Finest Coachbuilding Group LLC. Objections due by 5/1/2025. (Eckard, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proposed Order
Att: 2 Notice