Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-12327

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:25-ap-50226
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:26 PM EDT
Counter-Claimant
Pastor Velasco
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Schlerf
Stinson LLP
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Finest Coachbuilding Group, LLC
Represented By
Mark W. Eckard
Raines Feldman Littrell, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pastor Velasco
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Schlerf
Stinson LLP
contact info
Pastor Velasco
contact info
Plaintiff
Finest Coachbuilding Group, LLC
Represented By
Mark W. Eckard
Raines Feldman Littrell, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 misc Declaration in Support Wed 04/30 10:40 PM
Declaration in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Related [+] Filed by Pastor Velasco. (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Original Note
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Forbearance Agreement
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Note
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Amended License Agreement
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - communications
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - UCC
11 11 plan Memorandum/Brief in Support Wed 04/30 10:21 PM
Memorandum/Brief of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Related [+] Filed by Pastor Velasco (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 2 pgs motion Summary Judgment(Adv) - Motion Wed 04/30 10:18 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Pastor Velasco. (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 04/11 3:54 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Related [+] Filed by Finest Coachbuilding Group, LLC (Eckard, Mark)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Service Tue 03/25 6:44 PM
Notice of Service of Pastor Velasco's Answer with Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims Related [+] Filed by Pastor Velasco (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 utility Corrective Entry Mon 03/24 10:30 AM
Corrective Entry~Docket was refiled under the correct event. Related [+] (Hollis, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 5 ,6
Saturday, March 22, 2025
6 6 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Sat 03/22 5:02 PM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Pastor Velasco against Finest Coachbuilding Group, LLC Filed by Pastor Velasco Mediation due date: 07/21/2025. (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 03/21 5:58 PM
(Entered in Error)Answer to Counterclaim Related [+] Filed by Pastor Velasco (Schlerf, Jeffrey)Modified on 3/24/2025 (COH).Modified on 3/24/2025 (COH)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, March 20, 2025
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/20 5:35 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Pastor Velasco. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Francella, Thomas)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 court Case Reassigned Tue 03/04 2:47 PM
Order of Reassignment Judge Thomas M Horan added to case. Involvement of Judge John T Dorsey Terminated (JMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 02/12 8:22 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50226 JTD] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A12025359, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 02/12 8:20 PM
Adversary case 25-50226 Complaint by Finest Coachbuilding Group, LLC against Pastor Velasco. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/13/2025. (Eckard, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (s) 1 through 4