Original Case: 2:14-cv-16744

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv.us-01998
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 11, 2024 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By
Jennifer Maureen Mankins
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Robert Lundman
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL S. REGAN, in his official capacity as Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By
Jennifer Maureen Mankins
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Robert Lundman
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RON FOSTER
Represented By
William McCandless Herlihy
SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
FOSTER FARMS, LLC
Represented By
William McCandless Herlihy
SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARKETING & PLANNING SPECIALISTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By
William McCandless Herlihy
SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/11/2024 4:16 AM EDT
Thursday, October 10, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-16744. Case manager: KHancock. [1001652503] 24-1998 KH [Entered: 10/10/2024 12:19 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-16744. [1001652506] 24-1998 KH [Entered: 10/10/2024 12:21 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs ORDER filed consolidating case 24-1998 with 19-2208 Copies to all parties. [1001652686] 19-2208 24-1998 KH [Entered: 10/10/2024 02:46 PM]
Related: [-]