Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03126

Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 2:24-cv-00113
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Case in other court:Texas Northern, 3:24-cv-01797
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 4:23 AM MDT
Defendant
AT&T Inc.
Represented By
Tamara D Baggett
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
C Shawn Cleveland
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Mark Williams
Williams Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Dina Winger
Represented By
Lori Feldman
George Feldman Mcdonald PLLC
contact info
Patrick Yarborough
Foster Yarborough PLLC
contact info
Damon Edwin Mathias
Mathias Raphael PLLC
contact info
Ori Raphael
Mathias Raphael PLLC
contact info
Michael Liskow
George Feldman Mcdonald, PLLC
contact info

GPO Oct 21 2024
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lori G. Feldman. Counsel shall file a notice of appearance in the master docket 2:24-md-3126-BMM. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/21/2024. (MMS)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
56 56 motion Leave to File Under Seal - SDM Fri 05/16 9:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Their Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration Under Seal . Paul Anthony Werner, III appearing for MDL - Notice Only Lendingtree, LLC, QuoteWizard.com, LLC, Defendants Lendingtree, LLC, LendingTree, LLC, Lendingtree, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM-JTJ et al. (Werner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit F,
Att: 6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit G,
Att: 7 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit H