Original Case: 2:14-cv-16744

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv.us-02068
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 13, 2024 8:43 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By
David Seth Frankel
UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
contact info
Robert Lundman
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Jennifer Maureen Mankins
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
MICHAEL S. REGAN, in his official capacity as Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By
David Seth Frankel
UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
contact info
Robert Lundman
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Jennifer Maureen Mankins
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RON FOSTER
Represented By
William McCandless Herlihy
SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC
contact info
Damien M. Schiff
PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
contact info
Frank D. Garrison IV
PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
FOSTER FARMS, LLC
Represented By
William McCandless Herlihy
SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC
contact info
Damien M. Schiff
PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
contact info
Frank D. Garrison IV
PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARKETING & PLANNING SPECIALISTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By
William McCandless Herlihy
SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC
contact info
Damien M. Schiff
PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
contact info
Frank D. Garrison IV
PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/13/2024 8:41 AM EST
Friday, October 25, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-16744. Case manager: KHancock. [1001661769] 24-2068 KH [Entered: 10/25/2024 04:43 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-16744. [1001661775] 24-2068 KH [Entered: 10/25/2024 04:48 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs ORDER filed consolidating case 24-2068 with 19-2208 Cross-appeal appellant: Foster Farms, LLC, Ron Foster and Marketing & Planning Specialists Limited Partnership. Copies to all parties. [1001661785] 19-2208 24-2068 KH [Entered: 10/25/2024 04:59 PM]
Related: [-]