Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:24-bk-12443
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 10, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation
200 Euphoria Ave
Oak Ridge, TN 37830
Represented By
Michael R. Nestor
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Elizabeth Soper Justison
Young Conaway
contact info
Matthew Barry Lunn
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Shella Borovinskaya
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 10:27 AM EDT
Claims Agent
Stretto, Inc.
410 Exchange Suite 100
Irvine, CA 92602
Creditor
Hatch Associates Consultants, Inc.
Represented By
Samuel Robert Grego
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C.
contact info
Katherine Hemming
Campbell & Levine
contact info
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, a Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson, Esq. 425 Market St., Suite 2900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
James E. Huggett
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Mark Magnozzi
The Magnozzi Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter PC
contact info
Benjamin Rachelson
The Magnozzi Law Firm PC
contact info
Creditor
National Technology & Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC
Represented By
Kevin Scott Mann
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Hyundai Engineering Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Scott D. Cousins
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Creditor
Enterprise Bank & Trust
Represented By
Michael David Van Gorder
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Creditor
c/o Pamela Webster Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
1000 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1500
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Pamela K. Webster
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Creditor
AmTrust North America, Inc. on behalf of Technology Insurance Company, Inc.
23611 Chagrin Blvd. Suite 207
Beachwood, OH 44122
Creditor
AVS, Inc.
Represented By
Marques C Lipton
Lipton Law Group, LLC
contact info
Bradley P. Lehman
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
EACL Consulting Services
Creditor Committee
MPR Associates Inc
320 King St
Alexandria, VA 22314
Creditor Committee
Navton Consulting Services LLC
825 Georgia St
Key West, FL 33040
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Catherine V. LoTempio
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Andrew Ehrmann
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Robert J Gayda
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Jeremy W. Ryan
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Sarah R Gladieux
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Andrew Matott
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Laura E. Miller
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Levi Akkerman
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Christopher M. Samis
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Interested Party
UT-Battelle, LLC
Represented By
Julia Bettina Klein
Klein LLC
contact info
Gordon J. Toering
Warner Norcross + Judd LLP
contact info
Interested Party
TR Capital Management LLC
Interested Party
USNC Investment, LLC
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Nathan A. Haynes
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
X Energy LLC
Represented By
Matthew P. Milana
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Huiqi Liu
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Interested Party
Waqar Zaidi
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Michael David Van Gorder
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Standard Nuclear, Inc.
Represented By
Peter Justin Haley
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
William D. Sullivan
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Interested Party
JMB Capital Partners Lending LLC, as DIP Lender and Prepetition First Lien Lender
Represented By
Francisco Vazquez
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Emily Hong
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Robert M. Hirsh
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Donnelly
Morris James LLP
contact info
Jason S. Levin
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ritesh Budree
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Michael David Van Gorder
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Algonquins of Pikwakanagan First Nation
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Malcolm M Bates
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
535 535 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 05/07 4:47 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Supplemental re: Notice of: (I) Approval of Disclosure Statement on an Interim Basis; and (II) the Hearing to Consider (A) Final Approval of the Disclosure Statement as Containing Adequate Information and (B) Confirmation of the Plan (Docket No. 393), [Customized] Class 4 (General Unsecured Claims) Ballot for Voting to Accept or Reject the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation for Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation and Its Affiliated Debtors (substantively in the form of Exhibit 1-B to Docket No. 387), Notice of (I) Entry of Confirmation Order, (II) Occurrence of Effective Date, and (III) Related Bar Dates (Docket No.516), Instructions for Accessing the Disclosure Statement, the Plan, and Solicitation Procedures Order (attached hereto as Exhibit A), Postage Pre-Paid Business Reply Envelope . Filed by Stretto, Inc.. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 387 ,393 ,516
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
534 534 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Tue 05/06 4:38 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Fifth Monthly Application of Seward & Kissel LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Reactor Parent Wind-Down, Inc., et al., for the period March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Related [+] Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Ehrmann, Andrew)
Related: [-] 515
533 533 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Tue 05/06 4:36 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding, Third Monthly Application of Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Delaware Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation, et al., for the period February 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Related [+] Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Ehrmann, Andrew)
Related: [-] 514
532 532 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Tue 05/06 3:43 PM
Application for Compensation // Fifth Monthly Application of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial and Restructuring Advisor to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for the period from March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Filed by Reactor Parent Wind-Down, Inc.. Objections due by 5/27/2025. (Justison, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, May 02, 2025
531 531 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Fri 05/02 4:40 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Ehrmann, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
530 530 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Wed 04/30 4:04 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Fourth Monthly Application of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial and Restructuring Advisor to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for the Period from February 1, 2025 through February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Reactor Parent Wind-Down, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 497
529 529 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 04/30 2:36 PM
Notice of Hearing Regarding First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) Filed by Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Ehrmann, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service