Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12443

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:24-bk-12444
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation - Technologies
200 Euphoria Ave
Oak Ridge, TN 37830
Represented By
Michael R. Nestor
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/02 3:09 PM
Order Granting Debtors' Motion to Authorize Change of Case Caption. "An order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed, in accordance with the corporate name change of Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation Technologies, to Reactor Sub One Wind-Down, Inc." In addition, the Clerk of the Court is authorized to modify the docket of case number 24-12444 (KBO) with the Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation Technologies new name as soon as possible. Signed on 4/2/2025. (KAR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
6 6 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 01/14 6:34 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation - Technologies. (Justison, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 11/27 9:37 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. [REDACTED] Filed by Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation - Technologies. (Justison, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit SOFAs
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 11/27 9:34 AM
[SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation - Technologies. (Justison, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 10/29 3:30 PM
Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation, Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation - Technologies, USNC-Power Ltd., and Global First Power Limited. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation, Case No. 24-12443 (KBO), should be consulted for all matters concerning this case. Order Signed on 10/29/2024 (Mml)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/29 2:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12444 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11863394, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 10/29 7:16 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Ultra Safe Nuclear Corporation - Technologies. (Nestor, Michael)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Tue 10/29 8:42 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (SJS)
Related: [-]