Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-01123

Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Dales
Case #: 1:24-ap-80075
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc.
1111 Old Eagle School Road
Wayne, PA 19087
Represented By
De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly M. Hagan
Represented By
Kevin M. Smith
Beadle Smith, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Judgment Mon 01/06 11:59 AM
Consent Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 1/6/2025 (kap)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan,7 Stipulation
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 motion Settlement Mon 12/30 11:49 AM
Stipulated Motion for Settlement - Consent Judgment Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
6 6 order Extend Time Mon 12/02 7:17 AM
Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Related [+] Signed on 11/27/2024. (kap)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
5 5 motion Extend Time Wed 11/20 12:34 PM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Complaint Filed by Defendant De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc. (00292Rubin, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 10/31 9:23 AM
Summons Service Executed on De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc. 10/31/2024 (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 10/31 9:14 AM
Summons Service Executed on De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc. 10/31/2024 (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 10/30 2:23 PM
Summons Issued on De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc. Date Issued 10/30/2024, Answer Due 11/29/2024 (lmj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 3:13 PM
Adversary case 24-80075 14 Related [+]) 12) 91 (Declaratory judgment)) : Complaint by Kelly M. Hagan against De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc.. Fee Amount of $350 is DEFERRED with Request to Defer by Plaintiff. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - othercovery of money/property - 547 preference