Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20240

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James R Ahler
Case #: 2:24-ap-02040
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scott Joseph Fitts
945 Lake Street
Crown Point, IN 46307
Represented By
Scott Joseph Fitts
contact info
Plaintiff
Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc.
Represented By
Schuyler Geller
Burke Costanza & Carberry LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Nancy J. Gargula
100 East Wayne Street, 5th Floor
South Bend, IN 46601


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/06 12:21 PM
Order Related [+] Pre-Trial Order due by 9/30/2025. Discovery due by 9/2/2025.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc.e
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 misc Proposed Order Mon 05/05 5:41 PM
Proposed Order Filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc. Related [+] (Geller, Schuyler). Modified on 5/6/2025
Related: [-] 10 Report filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc.e
10 10 misc Report(AP) Mon 05/05 5:39 PM
Joint Report on Mediation and Scheduling Stipulation Filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc. and Defendant Scott Joseph Fitts (Geller, Schuyler) Modified on 5/6/2025 Related [+]
Related: [-] e
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/06 10:23 AM
Joint Scheduling Stipulation Related [+]. Pre-Trial Order due by 7/3/2025. Discovery due by 6/3/2025. Mediation Report due by 5/2/2025
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc.e
Monday, December 30, 2024
8 8 motion Amend - Motion(AP) Mon 12/30 6:04 PM
Motion to Amend Agreed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc. Related [+] (Geller, Schuyler)
Related: [-] 7 Scheduling Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
7 7 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/12 8:58 AM
Scheduling Order for Dischargeability Proceeding Related [+]. Pre-Trial Order due by 3/12/2025. Discovery due by 2/10/2025.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc.e
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/03 11:15 AM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Defendant Scott Joseph Fitts (Freeland, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 misc Statement of Corp. Ownership Tue 11/19 11:09 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc. (Geller, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
4 4 order File Wed 11/06 9:27 AM
Order to File Corporate Ownership Statement Related [+]. Documents due by 11/20/2024.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc.e
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic(AP) Tue 11/05 3:44 PM
Receipt Number A25045254, Fee Amount $350.00 Related [+].
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc.e
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 11/01 12:45 PM
Summons Issued on Scott Joseph Fitts Date Issued 11/1/2024, Answer Due 12/2/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] e
2 2 order Pay Fee Fri 11/01 12:41 PM
Order to Pay Fee Related [+]. Fee due by 11/8/2024.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc.e
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 12:39 PM
Adversary case 24-02040 Complaint (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud),67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Complaint by Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc. against Scott Joseph Fitts . Fee Amount $350 . Related [+]
Related: [-] e