New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 3:24-bk-20922
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 23, 2025
43 43 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/23 2:42 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DIP Acct Mar 18 Apr 17 2025
Att: 2 Exhibit DIP Acct Apr 18 May 17 2025
Friday, April 25, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 04/25 1:17 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/25/2025; Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/3/2025. filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq
Thursday, April 24, 2025
42 42 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 04/24 1:19 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DIP Acct Feb 18 Mar 17 2025
Att: 2 Exhibit DIP Acct Mar 18 Apr 17 2025
41 41 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 04/24 1:17 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DIP Acct Jan 18 Feb 17 2025
Att: 2 Exhibit DIP Acct Feb 18 Mar 17 2025
40 40 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 04/24 1:15 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2025 filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DIP Acct Dec 18 2024_Jan 17 2025
Att: 2 Exhibit DIP Acct Jan 18 Feb 17 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 04/24 11:23 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/24/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 04/25/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 9 CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/3/2025. filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.
Thursday, April 17, 2025
39 39 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 1:41 PM
Adversary case 25-01158 Complaint by Walter Culkin against Harold Schwartz ; W.H.S., Inc. ; Green Tree Financial Servicing Corp. ; Paul Schwartz Management DBP. Fee Amount $ 350.. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 04/10 12:05 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/10/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 9 CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/3/2025. filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
38 38 court Determination of Adjournment Request Wed 04/09 9:07 AM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to APRIL 24, 2025 at 10:00 am. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (wiq)
Related: [-] 9 CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING
Monday, March 24, 2025
37 37 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 03/24 5:13 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DIP Acct_Nov 25 2024_Dec 17 2024
Att: 2 Exhibit DIP Acct_Dec 18 2024_Jan 17 2025
36 36 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 03/24 5:11 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024 filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Dip Acct_Nov 25 2024_Dec 17 2024
Sunday, February 16, 2025
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 02/17 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
34 34 order Extending Debtor's Exclusive Time to File a Plan Fri 02/14 1:33 PM
ORDER REQUIRING DEBTOR TO FILE A PLAN AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Hearing (STATUS CONFERENCE). Time extended to 3/30/25. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/13/2025. (dmi
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 02/13 2:33 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/13/2025 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2025 at 10:00 AM , MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-] 9 CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/3/2025. filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
33 33 misc Financial Management Course Tue 02/04 1:40 PM
Certificate of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Financial Management Filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Fri 01/24 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
31 31 court Notice to File Financial Management Mon 01/20 5:40 AM
Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Thu 12/26 2:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney)([LINK 24-20922 MBK] ) [misc,amdsch3a] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47621904, fee amount $ 34.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#26
Sunday, December 22, 2024
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 12/23 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
29 29 order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) or Document(s) Fri 12/20 3:22 PM
Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) D, E/F Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/20/2024. (gan)
Related: [-] 26 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin
utility Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee) Fri 12/20 3:21 PM
Fee Due Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) $ 34. Related [+] (gan)
Related: [-] 26 Amended Schedule(s) : A/B,C,D,E/F,I,Statement of Current Monthly Income,Summary of Schedules filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin
Thursday, December 19, 2024
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/20 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/20 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Amended Schedules (Fee) - Use for All Amended Schedules Thu 12/19 12:36 PM
Amended Schedule(s) : A/B,C,D,E/F,I,Statement of Current Monthly Income,Summary of Schedules filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
25 25 order Retention Tue 12/17 12:38 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Aumack, Gregor & Associates LLC as Accountant Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/17/2024. (wiq)
Related: [-] 24
Thursday, December 12, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 12/12 1:42 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/12/2024; Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/3/2025. filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US TrusteeHearing scheduled for 02/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq
Monday, December 09, 2024
court Hearing Held Mon 12/09 10:17 AM
Minute of 12/9/2024; Hearing Held, OUTCOME: WITHDRAWN; MISSING SCHEDULES FILED Related [+] (wiq)
Related: [-] 7 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets/Liabilities and Stat Info - Individuals, Declaration About An Individuals Schedule, Statement of Financial Affairs For Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income(122B), 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Schedules A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H,I,J, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/4/2024. Hearing scheduled for 11/25/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.
Thursday, December 05, 2024
24 24 motion Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Thu 12/05 1:03 PM
Application For Retention of Professional Aumack, Gregor & Associates LLC as Accountant Filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Objection deadline is 12/12/2024. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Michael Tartza, CPA
Att: 2 Proposed Order
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 12/05 1:51 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/5/2024; Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/3/2025. filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 11:30 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 12/05 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
22 22 order Retention Mon 12/02 3:10 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Broege Neumann Fischer & Shaver LLC as ATTORNEY FOR DEBTOR Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/2/2024. (wiq)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, November 29, 2024
21 21 misc Document Fri 11/29 10:46 AM
Document re: Notice of Telephonic 341 Meeting of Creditors filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
20 20 misc Document Mon 11/25 10:32 AM
Document re: Statement of Current Monthly Income Related [+] filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Timothy)
Related: [-] 19 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin
19 19 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Mon 11/25 2:34 AM
Missing Document(s): Schedules,Atty Disclosure Statement,Declaration About An Individuals Scheds,Declaration About An Individuals Schedules,20 Largest Unsecured Creditors,Statement of Financial Affairs For Individuals,Statement of Financial Affairs For Individuals,Summary of Assets/Liabilities and Stat Info,Summary of Assets/Liabilities and Stat Info - Individuals,Summary of Assets/Liabilities and Stat Info - Individuals A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H,I,J, filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Mon 11/25 10:36 AM
Remark. No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (mrg)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 11/25 11:54 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 11/25/2024 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-] 7 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets/Liabilities and Stat Info - Individuals, Declaration About An Individuals Schedule, Statement of Financial Affairs For Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income(122B), 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Schedules A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H,I,J, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/4/2024. Hearing scheduled for 11/25/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.
Thursday, November 21, 2024
18 18 misc Support Thu 11/21 9:28 AM
Amended Certification of Professional in support of Related [+] filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Timothy)
Related: [-] 4 Application for Retention filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin
Monday, November 11, 2024
17 17 claims Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 11/11 2:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Jordan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 11/07 10:44 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Lieb, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 11/07 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 11/07 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 11/07 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Thu 11/07 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
11 11 claims Notice of Appearance and Request Wed 11/06 6:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Sharma, Amitkumar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
10 10 misc Certification of Debtor in Possession Tue 11/05 12:00 PM
Certification of Debtor in Possession Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (wdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
9 9 court Notice of Hearing (Upload) Mon 11/04 1:18 PM
CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. Related [+]. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/3/2025. filed by Debtor Walter D. Culkin
8 8 misc Certification of Debtor in Possession Mon 11/04 10:03 AM
Certification of Debtor in Possession Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (mrg)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Show Cause Mon 11/04 9:52 AM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets/Liabilities and Stat Info - Individuals, Declaration About An Individuals Schedule, Statement of Financial Affairs For Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income(122B), 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Schedules A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H,I,J, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/4/2024. Hearing scheduled for 11/25/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (mmf)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Judge Kaplan's Zoom Order Mon 11/04 8:44 AM
TEXT ORDER: Beginning on February 2, 2023, Judge Kaplan's regular Thursday motion calendar (addressing Chapter 7 & 11 cases) will utilize ZOOM for remote appearances. Parties remain free to request in-person appearances by contacting Chambers and the Court may direct same if, in the Court's discretion, in-person appearances are appropriate. Otherwise, remote appearances will be conducted via ZOOM ONLY. Please find the Zoom link on Judge Kaplan's page on the Court's website: http://www.njb.uscourts.gov/content/honorable-michael-b-kaplan. To appear via Zoom, parties may click on the Zoom link on the website or use a telephone to dial-in using the dial-in information. Please visit Judge Kaplan's page on the Court's website for further information regarding appearances, including the Court's Zoom appearance guidelines. (mmf)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Mon 11/04 7:17 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/5/2024 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic.Deadline to file a complaint objecting to discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of the plan. Deadline to file a complaint to determine whether certain debts are dischargeable is 2/3/2025. Proofs of Claim due by 1/13/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/2/2025. (mrg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 03, 2024
4 4 motion Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Sun 11/03 3:54 PM
Application For Retention of Professional Broege Neumann Fischer & Shaver LLC as Attorneys for Debtor Filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Objections due by 11/25/2024. (Neumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 misc Certification of Debtor in Possession Sun 11/03 3:05 PM
Certification of Debtor in Possession filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Credit Counseling Sun 11/03 2:48 PM
Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. (Neumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 11/03 2:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Timothy P. Neumann on behalf of Walter D. Culkin. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/3/2025. (Neumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]