Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-20922

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:25-ap-01158
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Harold Schwartz, as Executor of the Estate of Paul C. Shwartz
63 Adair Court
Malverne, NY 11565
Represented By
Harold Schwartz
contact info
Defendant
W.H.S., Inc.
90 Woodridge Center Drive
Woodbridge, NJ 07095
Represented By
W.H.S., Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Green Tree Financial Servicing Corp.
332 Minnesota St. Suite 610
St. Paul, MN 55101
Represented By
Green Tree Financial Servicing Corp.
contact info
Defendant
Paul Schwartz Management DBP
63 Adair Court
Malverne, NY 11565
Represented By
Paul Schwartz Management DBP
contact info
Plaintiff
Walter Culkin, Plaintiff
33 Denise Ct.
Manalapan, NJ 07726
Represented By
Geoffrey P. Neumann
Broege, Neumann, Fischer & Shaver, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/23 2:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Geoffrey P. Neumann on behalf of Walter Culkin. (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 25-01158 Complaint by Walter Culkin against Harold Schwartz ; W.H.S., Inc. ; Green Tree Financial Servicing Corp. ; Paul Schwartz Management DBP. Fee Amount $ 350.. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) filed by Plaintiff Walter Culkin
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 04/21 2:09 PM
Summons Issued to Walter D. Culkin for Service on Green Tree Financial Servicing Corp. Answer due on 5/21/2025; Paul Schwartz Management DBP Answer due on 5/21/2025; Harold Schwartz Answer due on 5/21/2025; W.H.S., Inc. Answer due on 5/21/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/23/2025 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (gan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Joint Order Scheduling Pretrial Proceedings and Trial
Thursday, April 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 1:41 PM
Adversary case 25-01158 Complaint by Walter Culkin against Harold Schwartz ; W.H.S., Inc. ; Green Tree Financial Servicing Corp. ; Paul Schwartz Management DBP. Fee Amount $ 350.. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Neumann, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]