Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-30772

Illinois Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laura K Grandy
Case #: 3:24-ap-03028
Nature of Suit71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bank of Springfield
3400 W Wabash Ave
Springfield, IL 62711
Represented By
Bank of Springfield
contact info
Plaintiff
James Lee Franklin, Jr
2331 Pebble Creek Dr
Alton, IL 62002
Represented By
James Lee Franklin, Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
Addie Christine Franklin
2331 Pebble Creek Dr
Alton, IL 62002
Represented By
Addie Christine Franklin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/24 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Minutes of Court
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
20 20 order Minutes of Court Wed 01/22 11:47 AM
Minutes of Court Related [+]. (kw)
Related: [-] 13 Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Bank of Springfield
Thursday, January 09, 2025
19 19 answer Reply Mon 01/13 8:24 AM
Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiffs Addie Christine Franklin, James Lee Franklin Jr Related [+]. (tf)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Bank of Springfield
Saturday, December 28, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/28 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/28 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Hearing Scheduled
Friday, December 27, 2024
16 16 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 12/27 1:19 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Defendant Bank of Springfield. (Volmert, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
15 15 court Hearing Scheduled Thu 12/26 12:59 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+]. Hearing before Judge Mary E. Lopinot scheduled for 1/22/2025 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. (js)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Bank of Springfield
14 14 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/26 10:11 AM
Order for Corporate Ownership Statement. Miscellaneous Deadline: 1/9/2025. (ki)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/23 1:10 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Bank of Springfield (Volmert, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/03 9:49 AM
Amended Summons Service Executed on Bank of Springfield 11/25/2024.. (rh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/26 2:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bank of Springfield 11/26/2024.. (tf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
10 10 court Certificate of Service Mon 11/25 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service - 3 copies of Summons hand delivered to Plaintiff James Lee Franklin Jr Related [+]. (rh)
Related: [-] 9 Summons Issued
9 9 court Summons Issued Mon 11/25 2:23 PM
3 Summons Issued to Plaintiff James Lee Franklin, Jr. Bank of Springfield Answer Due 12/26/2024. (rh)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/25 1:43 PM
Amended Complaint by Addie Christine Franklin, James Lee Franklin Jr against Bank of Springfield. Related [+]. (rh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Lee Franklin, Plaintiff Addie Christine Franklin
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
7 7 court Exhibit - Crt User Wed 11/13 12:35 PM
Correspondence with United States Filed by Plaintiffs Addie Christine Franklin, James Lee Franklin Jr. (tf)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/13 12:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bank of Springfield 11/5/2024.. (tf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/09 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Reassigning Case
Thursday, November 07, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/07 2:45 PM
Order Reassigning Case Judge Mary E. Lopinot added to case. Involvement of Judge Laura K. Grandy Terminated (nm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
3 3 court Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 5:29 PM
Certificate of Service - 3 copies of Summons hand delivered to Plaintiff James Lee Franklin Jr, and Plaintiff Addie Christine Franklin Related [+]. (rh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Lee Franklin, Plaintiff Addie Christine Franklin
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 11/04 2:36 PM
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/04 2:36 PM
(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))),(71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)) Complaint by James Lee Franklin Jr, Addie Christine Franklin against Bank of Springfield Fee Amount $350. (rh)
Related: [-]