Illinois Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 3:24-bk-30772
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 12:00 PM CDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
94 94 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/28 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/28/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 93 Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
93 93 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/26 9:06 AM
Order Closing Case (nm)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 02/26 9:28 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (nm)
Related: [-]