Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-30772

Illinois Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laura K Grandy
Case #: 3:24-ap-03029
Nature of Suit71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bank of Springfield
3400 W Wabash Ave
Springfield, IL 62711
Represented By
Bank of Springfield
contact info
Plaintiff
James Lee Franklin, Jr
2331 Pebble Creek Dr
Alton, IL 62002
Represented By
James Lee Franklin, Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
Addie Christine Franklin
2331 Pebble Creek Dr
Alton, IL 62002
Represented By
Addie Christine Franklin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/24 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
14 14 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/22 4:28 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (tf)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/08 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/06 3:52 PM
Order Related [+]. Hearing rescheduled before Judge Mary E. Lopinot scheduled for 1/28/2025 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. (tf)
Related: [-] 8 Regarding Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Bank of Springfield
Friday, December 27, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 12/27 1:21 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Defendant Bank of Springfield. (Volmert, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/05 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Hearing Scheduled
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
9 9 court Hearing Scheduled Tue 12/03 11:24 AM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+]. Hearing before Judge Mary E. Lopinot scheduled for 1/7/2025 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. (js)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Bank of Springfield
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/02 1:32 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Bank of Springfield (Volmert, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
7 7 court Exhibit - Crt User Wed 11/13 12:36 PM
Correspondence with United States Filed by Plaintiffs Addie Christine Franklin, James Lee Franklin Jr. (tf)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/13 12:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bank of Springfield 11/5/2024.. (tf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/09 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Reassigning Case
Thursday, November 07, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/07 2:46 PM
Order Reassigning Case Judge Mary E. Lopinot added to case. Involvement of Judge Laura K. Grandy Terminated (nm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
3 3 court Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 5:29 PM
Certificate of Service - 3 copies of Summons hand delivered to Plaintiff James Lee Franklin Jr, and Plaintiff Addie Christine Franklin Related [+]. (rh)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued (auto) filed by Plaintiff James Lee Franklin, Plaintiff Addie Christine Franklin
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 11/04 2:45 PM
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/04 2:45 PM
(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))),(71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)) Complaint by James Lee Franklin Jr, Addie Christine Franklin against Bank of Springfield Fee Amount $350. (rh)
Related: [-]