Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-30772

Illinois Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laura K Grandy
Case #: 3:24-ap-03030
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
PO Box 650783
Dallas, TX 75265
Represented By
Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Lee Franklin, Jr
2331 Pebble Creek Dr
Alton, IL 62002
Represented By
James Lee Franklin, Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
Addie Christine Franklin
2331 Pebble Creek Dr
Alton, IL 62002
Represented By
Addie Christine Franklin
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, January 24, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/24 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Minutes of Court
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
18 18 order Minutes of Court Wed 01/22 11:57 AM
Minutes of Court Related [+]. (kw)
Related: [-] 13 Granting Motion to Quash filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC; Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, January 09, 2025
17 17 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 01/13 8:29 AM
Summons Service Executed on Codilis Associates P.C. Illinois Law Offices 1/8/2025.. (tf)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 01/13 8:27 AM
Summons Service Executed on Erin E Edwards 1/8/2025.. (tf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 28, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/28 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Hearing Scheduled
Thursday, December 26, 2024
14 14 court Hearing Scheduled Thu 12/26 12:44 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+]. Hearing before Judge Mary E. Lopinot scheduled for 1/22/2025 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. (js)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Quash filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
13 13 motion Quash Tue 12/24 11:28 AM
Motion to Quash Service with Brief in Support Filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (Edwards, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/03 9:50 AM
Amended Summons Service Executed on Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC 11/25/2024.. (rh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/26 2:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC 11/26/2024.. (tf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
10 10 court Certificate of Service Mon 11/25 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service - 3 copies of Summons hand delivered to Plaintiff James Lee Franklin Jr Related [+]. (rh)
Related: [-] 9 Summons Issued
9 9 court Summons Issued Mon 11/25 2:19 PM
3 Summons Issued to Plaintiff James Lee Franklin Jr. Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC Answer Due 12/26/2024. (rh)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Exhibit - Crt User Mon 11/25 2:09 PM
Exhibit Filed by Plaintiffs Addie Christine Franklin, James Lee Franklin Jr Related [+]. (rh)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Lee Franklin, Plaintiff Addie Christine Franklin
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/25 1:44 PM
Amended Complaint by Addie Christine Franklin, James Lee Franklin Jr against Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. Related [+]. (rh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Lee Franklin, Plaintiff Addie Christine Franklin
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/13 12:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC 11/5/2024.. (tf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/09 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Reassigning Case
Thursday, November 07, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/07 2:47 PM
Order Reassigning Case Judge Mary E. Lopinot added to case. Involvement of Judge Laura K. Grandy Terminated (nm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
3 3 court Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 5:28 PM
Certificate of Service - 3 copies of Summons hand delivered to Plaintiff James Lee Franklin Jr, and Plaintiff Addie Christine Franklin Related [+]. (rh)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued (auto) filed by Plaintiff James Lee Franklin, Plaintiff Addie Christine Franklin
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 11/04 2:52 PM
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/04 2:52 PM
(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Complaint by James Lee Franklin Jr, Addie Christine Franklin against Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC Fee Amount $350. (rh)
Related: [-]