Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-33553

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:24-ap-03238
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Terminated:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nicole Hockley
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Nicole Hockley
contact info
Defendant
Erica L. Ash
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Erica L. Ash
contact info
Defendant
Robert Parker
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Robert Parker
contact info
Defendant
Carlee Soto Parisi
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Carlee Soto Parisi
contact info
Defendant
Jillian Soto- Marino
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Jillian Soto- Marino
contact info
Defendant
Donna Soto
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Donna Soto
contact info
Defendant
CARLOS M. SOTO
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
CARLOS M. SOTO
contact info
Defendant
William Sherlach
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
William Sherlach
contact info
Defendant
William Aldenberg
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
William Aldenberg
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Hensel
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Jennifer Hensel
contact info
Defendant
Ian Hockley
303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Ian Hockley
contact info
Defendant
David Wheeler
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
David Wheeler
contact info
Defendant
Francine Wheeler
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC Ryan E. Chapple 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Francine Wheeler
contact info
Defendant
Jacqueline Barden
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Aiston, TX 78701
Represented By
Jacqueline Barden
contact info
Defendant
Mark Barden
303 Colorado Street Suite 2850
Austin, TX 70701
Represented By
Mark Barden
contact info
Defendant
Global Tetrahedron, LLC
730 N. Franklin Street Suite 700
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Global Tetrahedron, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Murray, Chapter 7 Trustee
Jones Murray, LLP 602 Sawyer Street, Suite 400
Houston, TX 77007
Represented By
Christopher Murray, Chapter 7 Trustee
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander E. Jones
xxxx xxxxxx
Austin, TX 78735
Represented By
Ben C Broocks
Broocks Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Shelby A Jordan
Jordan & Ortiz, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Monday, February 03, 2025
38 38 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/03 4:06 PM
First Amended Complaint Related [+] (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Declaration and Exhibits
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/02 11:22 AM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3238 Closed. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
37 37 misc Exhibit List Thu 12/05 11:46 AM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By William Aldenberg, Erica L. Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Jillian Soto- Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, CARLOS M. SOTO, William Sherlach, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler ). (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice Thu 12/05 9:38 AM
Notice of Corrected Exhibit A to X Corp.'s Limited Statement and Reservation of Rights . Related [+] Filed by X Corp.
Related: [-] 22 Statementckler, Caroline
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/27 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Generic Order
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/27 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/27 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/27 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/27 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/27 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Monday, November 25, 2024
29 29 order Generic Order Mon 11/25 4:45 PM
Order Denying Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order Related [+]. Signed on 11/25/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
28 28 court Courtroom Minutes Mon 11/25 4:44 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:00 PM. Appearances: PLEASE SEE ATTACHED. Related [+]. Hearing held. Motion deemed Moot. Parties are to notify the Court's Case Manager once they have agreed on a date for an Evidentiary Hearing. (zac4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
27 27 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/25 12:39 PM
Order Granting Motion for Leslie Liberman To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 11/25/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 15
26 26 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/25 12:38 PM
Order Granting Motion for Kyle J. Kimpler To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 11/25/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 14
25 25 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/25 12:36 PM
Order Granting Motion for Paul Paterson To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 11/25/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 12
24 24 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/25 12:35 PM
Order Granting Motion for Vida J. Robinson To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 11/25/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 11
23 23 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/25 12:34 PM
Order Granting Motion for Alinor C. Sterling To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 11/25/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 10
22 22 misc Statement Mon 11/25 10:58 AM
Statement / X Corp.'s Limited Statement and Reservation of Rights (Filed By X Corp. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaintckler, Caroline
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 11/25 10:56 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Caroline A. Reckler Filed by on behalf of X Corp. Related [+]
Related: [-] ckler, Caroline
20 20 misc Statement Mon 11/25 10:44 AM
Statement in Support of the Trustee's Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order in Furtherance of the Sale of Assets of Free Speech Systems, LLC and in Opposition to the Emergency Motion to Disqualify Global Tetrahedron, LLC's Bid (Filed By William Aldenberg, Erica L. Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Jillian Soto- Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, CARLOS M. SOTO, William Sherlach, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler ). (Skarnulis, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 11/25 8:39 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ben C Broocks Filed by on behalf of Alexander E. Jones (Broocks, Ben)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 24, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/24 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
17 17 misc Statement Sun 11/24 10:55 PM
Statement in Support of Trustee's Expedited Motion for Entry of an Order in Furtherance of the Sale of Assets of Free Speech Systems, LLC and Omnibus Reply Related Thereto (Filed By Global Tetrahedron, LLC ). (Costa, Gregg)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Objection Sun 11/24 10:11 PM
Objection - Trustee's Objection to the Debtor's Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order . Filed by Christopher Murray, Chapter 7 Trustee (Wolfshohl, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 22, 2024
15 15 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/22 2:46 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie Liberman (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25732166) Filed by William Aldenberg, Erica L. Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Jillian Soto- Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, CARLOS M. SOTO, William Sherlach, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/22 12:29 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kyle J. Kimpler (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25731438) Filed by William Aldenberg, Erica L. Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Jillian Soto- Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, CARLOS M. SOTO, William Sherlach, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/22 11:03 AM
Order Granting Motion for Jason Z. Goldstein To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 11/22/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 9
12 12 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/22 7:32 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Paterson (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25730347) Filed by William Aldenberg, Erica L. Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Jillian Soto- Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, CARLOS M. SOTO, William Sherlach, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/22 7:28 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Vida J. Robinson (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25730344) Filed by William Aldenberg, Erica L. Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Jillian Soto- Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, CARLOS M. SOTO, William Sherlach, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/22 7:27 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alinor C. Sterling (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25730340) Filed by William Aldenberg, Erica L. Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Jillian Soto- Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, CARLOS M. SOTO, William Sherlach, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
9 9 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 11/21 10:30 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason Z. Goldstein (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25729708) Filed by Global Tetrahedron, LLC (Costa, Gregg)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 11/21 10:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Gregg Jeffrey Costa Filed by on behalf of Global Tetrahedron, LLC (Costa, Gregg)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Exhibit List Thu 11/21 8:34 PM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By Alexander E. Jones ) Related [+] (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
Att: 14 Exhibit 14
Att: 15 Exhibit 15
Att: 16 Exhibit 16
6 6 misc Exhibit List Thu 11/21 11:58 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Christopher Murray, Chapter 7 Trustee ) Related [+] (Wolfshohl, Joshua)
Related: [-] 2 Notice
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
5 5 misc Exhibit List Thu 11/21 11:09 AM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By William Aldenberg, Erica L. Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Jillian Soto- Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, CARLOS M. SOTO, William Sherlach, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler ). (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 notice Notice Wed 11/20 8:05 PM
Notice of TRO-Related Requests, Notification of Important Interrelated Matters and Requests for Clarification and Continuance of Certain Matters . Filed by Alexander E. Jones (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Wed 11/20 3:46 PM
Certificate of Sevice (Filed By Alexander E. Jones ) Related [+] (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
2 2 notice Notice Tue 11/19 3:05 PM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Filed by Alexander E. Jones (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-] Certificate of Notice
court Certificate of Notice Tue 11/19 2:05 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted S. Jordan. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court Related [+]. TRO Hearing scheduled for 11/25/2024 at 02:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (rgs4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 18, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 11/18 9:12 PM
Adversary case 24-03238 Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint and Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7065 by Alexander E. Jones against Christopher Murray, Chapter 7 Trustee, Global Tetrahedron, LLC, Mark Barden, Jacqueline Barden, Francine Wheeler, David Wheeler, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Jennifer Hensel, William Aldenberg, William Sherlach, CARLOS M. SOTO, Donna Soto, Jillian Soto- Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, Erica L. Ash. Fee Amount $350 (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Adversary Cover Sheet