Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:24-bk-11451
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Dec 27, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025

Debtor
ADK Auto Sales, LLC
7304 Sligo Dr
Austin, TX 78754-7003
Represented By
Douglas J. Powell
Law Offices Of Douglas J. Powell
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randolph N Osherow
342 W Woodlawn, Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78212


Docket last updated: 11/21/2024 12:32 AM CST
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Wed 11/20 2:33 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (csupld)([LINK 24-11451 ) [caseupld,vol7cu] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A24920362 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Wed 11/20 2:32 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) filed by ADK Auto Sales, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 11/27/2024 (Powell, Douglas)
Related: [-]
2 2 court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 11/20 2:36 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Osherow, Randolph N added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/27/2024 at 09:00 AM at Zoom - Osherow: Meeting ID 366 703 6877, Passcode 8572973665, OR call 210-675-8716. (Powell, Douglas)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Wed 11/20 2:49 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Douglas J. Powell for Debtor ADK Auto Sales, LLC. (Powell, Douglas)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) filed by ADK Auto Sales, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 11/27/2024