Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-01123

Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Dales
Case #: 1:24-ap-80087
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Thompson Capital Group II, LLC
2725 Airview Blvd, Suite 300
Portage, MI 49002
Represented By
Thompson Capital Group II, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Thompson
13772 E. MN Ave
Climax, MI 49034
Represented By
Joshua Thompson
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly M. Hagan
Represented By
Kevin M. Smith
Beadle Smith, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Extend Time Tue 04/22 3:44 PM
Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery and to Extend Discovery Deadline Related [+] Signed on 4/22/2025. (lmj)
Related: [-] 23
Monday, April 21, 2025
23 23 motion Extend Time Mon 04/21 10:46 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Discovery Filed by Defendant Thompson Capital Group II, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
22 22 misc Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons) Mon 03/31 1:33 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Corrected First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admissions and for the Production of Documents served upon both Defendants.. Filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
court Hearing Continued (ADI) Wed 03/26 12:36 PM
Adjourned Hearing Related [+] Hearing to be held in Grand Rapids. Hearing scheduled 05/23/2025 at 11:00 AM at Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A). (ADI)
Related: [-] 13 Pretrial Conference - Adj.
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order (Generic/Motion) Wed 03/19 2:59 PM
Order to Adjourn Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Pretrial Hearing Adjourned to 5/23/2025 at 11:00 AM Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A). Signed on 3/19/2025 (lmj)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
20 20 4 pgs motion Adjourn/Continue Hearing Tue 03/18 3:50 PM
Stipulated Motion to Adjourn/Continue Hearing On Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] Hearing (Bk Motion) Adjourned Prior to Court
Thursday, March 06, 2025
19 19 utility Returned Mail (ADI) Thu 03/06 2:35 AM
Notice of Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 01/19/2025 to Thompson Capital Group II, LLC 2725 Airview Blvd, Suite 300 Portage, MI 49002-1806 was returned as undeliverable: Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference. This is a text-only entry. There are no documents attached. (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Adjourn/Continue Hearing Tue 03/04 2:27 PM
Order to Adjourn Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Pretrial Conference Scheduled for 3/25/2025 at 11:00 AM at Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A). Signed on 3/4/2025. (lmj)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation to Adjourn/Continue
court Hearing Adjourned Prior to Court Tue 03/04 2:52 PM
Hearing Adjourned Prior to Court Related [+] Hearing scheduled 03/25/2025 at 11:00 AM at Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A). (ADI)
Related: [-] 13 Pretrial Conference
Friday, February 28, 2025
17 17 motion Adjourn/Continue Hearing Fri 02/28 1:27 PM
Stipulation to Adjourn Dates Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan (Smith, Kevin) Modified on 3/3/2025 (kap)
Related: [-] 13 Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
16 16 4 pgs misc 7026 Disclosures/Discovery Report Wed 02/26 2:07 PM
7026 Disclosures/Discovery Report Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan, Defendants Joshua Thompson, Thompson Capital Group II, LLC (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 utility Returned Mail (ADI) Thu 01/30 2:35 AM
Notice of Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 01/19/2025 to Joshua Thompson 13772 E. MN Ave Climax, MI 49034-9643 was returned as undeliverable: Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference. This is a text-only entry. There are no documents attached. (ADI)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 19, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/20 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 01/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
13 13 2 pgs court Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference Fri 01/17 12:11 PM
Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference, Filing Discovery Plan and Scheduling Pretrial Conference. Parties shall meet in person or telephonically at least once on or before the pretrial conference is held to satisfy requirements pursuant to FRBP 7026(f). A report signed by all parties outlining discovery plan shall be filed with the Court on or before 14 days after 7026(f) conference. Signed on: 1/17/2025. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/18/2025 at 11:00 AM at Kalamazoo Courthouse. (tas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan
Thursday, January 16, 2025
12 12 15 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 7:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Joshua Thompson. (Bylenga, Steven)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs misc Jury Demand Thu 01/16 1:49 PM
Jury Demand Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Thompson Capital Group II, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-] 9 Answer to Complaint
10 10 4 pgs misc Affirmative Defenses Thu 01/16 1:48 PM
Affirmative Defenses Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Thompson Capital Group II, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,9 Answer to Complaint
9 9 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 1:47 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Thompson Capital Group II, LLC. (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs appr Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices Thu 01/16 1:46 PM
Corrected Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Thompson Capital Group II, LLC. (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons) Tue 01/14 10:01 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Thompson Capital Group II, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
6 6 order Extend Time Wed 01/08 12:21 PM
Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond Related [+] Signed on 1/8/2025. (kap)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 motion Extend Time Mon 01/06 2:02 PM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Trustee's Complaint Filed by Defendants Joshua Thompson, Thompson Capital Group II, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 appr Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices Mon 01/06 1:55 PM
Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendants Joshua Thompson, Thompson Capital Group II, LLC. (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
3 3 1 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 12/06 9:19 AM
Summons Service Executed on Joshua Thompson 12/6/2024; Thompson Capital Group II, LLC 12/6/2024 (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
2 2 2 pgs court Summons Issued Thu 12/05 3:03 PM
Summons Issued on Joshua Thompson Date Issued 12/5/2024, Answer Due 1/6/2025; Thompson Capital Group II, LLC Date Issued 12/5/2024, Answer Due 1/6/2025 (jaz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/04 12:10 PM
Adversary case 24-80087 13 Related [+]) 11) 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) : Complaint by Kelly M. Hagan against Thompson Capital Group II, LLC, Joshua Thompson. Fee Amount of $350 is DEFERRED with Request to Defer by Plaintiff. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property