Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:24-bk-26346
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 24, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Vobev, LLC
5454 W 150 S
Salt Lake City, UT 84104-6021
Represented By
Michael R. Johnson
Ray Quinney & Nebeker P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Washington Federal Bank Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
511 511 genaty Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 2:23 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 468 Application for Compensation,469 Notice
Monday, May 05, 2025
510 510 misc Certificate/Affidavit of Non-Opposition to Motion Mon 05/05 10:58 AM
Certificate/Affidavit of Non-Opposition to Motion Related [+] Third Monthly Fee Application of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Interim Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Vobev, LLC. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-] 461 Application for Compensation
509 509 misc Certificate/Affidavit of Non-Opposition to Motion Mon 05/05 10:50 AM
Certificate/Affidavit of Non-Opposition to Motion Related [+] Third Monthly Application of Lowenstein Sandler LLP, Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Vobev, LLC. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-] 464 Application for Compensation
Thursday, May 01, 2025
508 508 misc Certificate/Affidavit of Non-Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 3:34 PM
Certificate/Affidavit of Non-Opposition to Motion Related [+] Certificate of No Objection Regarding Second Interim Monthly Fee Application of Ray Quinney & Nebeker Filed by Vobev, LLC. (Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-] 468 Application for Compensation
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
507 507 genaty Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 11:39 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 492 Notice of Exhibit List,493 Notice
506 506 genaty Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 11:02 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 499 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order, Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan,500 Statement,501 Statement