Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-26346

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:25-ap-02008
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2025
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Vobev, LLC
5454 W 150 S
Salt Lake City, UT 84104
Represented By
Vobev, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Belvac Production Machinery, Inc.
Dover Corporation 3005 Highland Parkway, Suite 200
Downers Grove, IL 60515
Represented By
Cassandra Sepanik Shoemaker
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
David E. Finkelson
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Dion W. Hayes
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, February 10, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 02/10 11:16 AM
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Filed by Belvac Production Machinery, Inc. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Mon 02/10 11:43 AM
Adversary Case 2:25-ap-2008 Disposed. (amo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/29 8:52 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 25-02008 . Complaint by Belvac Production Machinery, Inc. against Vobev, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [91 (Declaratory judgment), 72 (Injunctive relief - other)]. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]