Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-13093

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 4:24-ap-00145
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alan Christopher Redmond
2005 Regency Drive
Wyomissing, PA 19610
Represented By
Albert Anthony Ciardi, III
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info
NICOLE MARIE NIGRELLI
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Scott Jordan
8500 Allentown Pike Suite 3
Blandon, PA 19510
Represented By
JOEL A. READY
Cornerstone Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Saturday, May 03, 2025
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/04 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #27 )
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #26 )
Thursday, May 01, 2025
27 27 order Amended Order Thu 05/01 4:31 PM
Amended Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the April 30, 2025 Order is AMENDED to provide that the deadline for the Defendant to file a Reply to the Plaintiffs Response is May 30, 2025 Related [+]. (MK)
Related: [-] 26
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 04/30 2:48 PM
Order Re: Plaintiffs Request to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (doc. #25);It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for the Plaintiff to file a Reply to the Defendants Response is May 30, 2025. Related [+]. (DR)
Related: [-] 48 3525
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
25 25 court Document Tue 04/29 11:18 AM
Document in re: Letter Request to Extend Time to File Reply Brief Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
24 24 misc Brief Mon 04/28 2:39 PM
Opposition Brief to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Rule 56(f)(1) Relief Filed by JOEL A. READY on behalf of Jason Scott Jordan Related [+]. (READY, JOEL)
Related: [-] 18
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/17 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #22 )
Monday, April 14, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 04/14 3:48 PM
Order: It is hereby ORDERED that all dates set forth in the Pretrial Order (doc. #8) are hereby suspended pending the outcome of the Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. #18) Re: Document filed by Defendant Alan Christopher Redmond Related [+]. (TD)
Related: [-] 3021
21 21 court Document Mon 04/14 11:41 AM
Document in re: Correspondence to Judge Mayer Filed by NICOLE MARIE NIGRELLI on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond Related [+]. (NIGRELLI, NICOLE)
Related: [-] 8 ,18 ,19
Thursday, April 03, 2025
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/04 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #19 )
Monday, March 31, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion For Summary Judgment Mon 03/31 5:20 PM
Order Granting Motion For Summary Judgment Related [+] The Plaintiff must file a response to the Motion on or before April 28, 2025, and The pretrial hearing scheduled for April 23, 2025 is canceled (JG)
Related: [-] 18
utility Corrective Entry Wed 04/30 10:54 AM
Corrective Entry re: Order Regarding Motion For Summary Judgment Related [+] The Plaintiff must file a response to the Motion on or before April 28, 2025, and The pretrial hearing scheduled for April 23, 2025 is canceled (JG(related document(s)19 ). (JG)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, March 28, 2025
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Fri 03/28 5:15 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Alan Christopher Redmond Represented by Albert Anthony Ciardi III(Counsel). (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Att: 8 Exhibit G - part 1
Att: 9 Exhibit G - part 2
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 court Document Tue 03/25 12:06 PM
Document in re: Objection of Debtor/Defendant Alan Christopher Redmond to Plaintiff's Untimely Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosure Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond Related [+]. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 Service List
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 court Document Mon 03/24 10:34 AM
Document in re: Correspondence to the Honorable Patricia M. Mayer Filed by JOEL A. READY on behalf of Jason Scott Jordan. (READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Document Mon 03/24 10:30 AM
Document in re: Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Civil Rule 26(a)(3) Filed by JOEL A. READY on behalf of Jason Scott Jordan. (READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
14 14 court Document Tue 03/18 11:47 AM
Document in re: Correspondence to the Honorable Patricia Mayer Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
13 13 court Document Mon 03/17 6:49 PM
Document in re: Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
12 12 court Document Wed 02/05 4:25 PM
Document in re: Plaintiff's Rule 26(f) Report Filed by JOEL A. READY on behalf of Jason Scott Jordan. (READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Document Wed 02/05 2:23 PM
Document in re: 26(f) Report of Defendant Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 23, 2025
10 10 misc Joint Statement Thu 01/23 11:34 AM
Joint Statement Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/17 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
8 8 order Amended Pre-Trial Order Tue 01/14 2:46 PM
Amended Pre-Trial Order. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM at PENN4 - 4TH fl Courtroom. (Roman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/11 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
6 6 order Pre-Trial Order Tue 01/07 9:56 AM
Pre-Trial Order. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled 4/24/2025 at 02:00 PM at PENN4 - 4TH fl Courtroom. Motions Due by 3/28/2025. Discovery due by 3/11/2025. Joint Statement due by 1/21/2025. (K., Marie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/06 4:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Alan Christopher Redmond.(Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/10 1:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Alan Christopher Redmond 12/10/2024 . (READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 12/09 2:46 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) Alan Christopher Redmond Date Issued 12/9/2024, Answer Due 1/8/2025. (R., Donna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Praecipe Mon 12/09 12:35 PM
Praecipe to Attach Exhibit Filed by JOEL A. READY on behalf of Jason Scott Jordan. (READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 5:23 PM
Adversary case 24-00145 Complaint by JOEL A. READY on behalf of Jason Scott Jordan against Alan Christopher Redmond. Fee Amount $350 . (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]