Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 4:24-bk-13093
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:17 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
361 361 22 pgs misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 05/02 7:34 AM
Amended Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2025 Filed by NICOLE MARIE NIGRELLI on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond . (DR)
Related: [-]
360 360 12 pgs misc Amended Document Thu 05/01 3:51 PM
Amended Document Amended February 2025 Monthly Operating Report Filed by NICOLE MARIE NIGRELLI on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond Related [+]. (NIGRELLI, NICOLE)
Related: [-] 316
Att: 1 10 pgs bank statement
359 359 1 pgs misc Praecipe to Withdraw Document Thu 05/01 3:31 PM
Praecipe to Withdraw Praecipe to Withdraw the First Amended Disclosure Statement Proposed by Alan Christopher Redmond Debtor-in-Possession Filed by NICOLE MARIE NIGRELLI on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond Related [+]. (NIGRELLI, NICOLE)
Related: [-] 312 ,313
358 358 1 pgs misc Praecipe to Withdraw Document Thu 05/01 3:29 PM
Praecipe to Withdraw Praecipe to Withdraw the First Amended Plan of Reorganization Proposed by Alan Christopher Redmond Debtor-In-Possession Filed by NICOLE MARIE NIGRELLI on behalf of Alan Christopher Redmond Related [+]. (NIGRELLI, NICOLE)
Related: [-] 311 ,310
Sunday, April 27, 2025
357 357 4 pgs court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 04/28 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #354 )
Friday, April 25, 2025
356 356 5 pgs court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/26 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #352 )
355 355 4 pgs court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/26 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #351 )
354 354 1 pgs order Stipulation Fri 04/25 11:39 AM
Order Granting Stipulation By American Workers Insurance Services, Inc. and Between Alan Chrisopher Redmond Extension of time to file adversary proceeding to and including May 30, 2025. Related [+]. (DR)
Related: [-] 353