Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:24-ap-01274
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sklar Exploration Company, LLC
5395 Pearl Parkway Suite 200
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
Sklar Exploration Company, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sklarco, LLC
5395 Pearl Parkway Suite 200
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
Sklarco, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee of The Sklarco Creditor Trust
Represented By
Stephen T Loden
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
53 53 order Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order Wed 05/14 11:56 AM
Minutes of Proceeding. The Court took the matter under advisement. Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 37 Motion
Friday, May 09, 2025
52 52 answer Objection Fri 05/09 4:54 PM
Objection Filed by Michael J. Pankow on behalf of Sklarco, LLC Related [+]. (Pankow, Michael)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,49 Witness List and Exhibits
Att: 1 Exhibit PX08
Att: 2 Exhibit PX09
Att: 3 Exhibit PX10
Att: 4 Exhibit PX11
Att: 5 Exhibit PX18
Att: 6 Exhibit PX19
Att: 7 Exhibit PX20
Att: 8 Exhibit PX21
Att: 9 Exhibit PX22
Att: 10 Exhibit PX23
Att: 11 Exhibit PX24
Att: 12 Exhibit PX25
Att: 13 Exhibit PX26
Att: 14 Exhibit PX27
Att: 15 Exhibit PX29
Att: 16 Exhibit PX30
Att: 17 Exhibit PX31
Att: 18 Exhibit PX32
Att: 19 Exhibit PX34
Att: 20 Exhibit PX35
Att: 21 Exhibit PX36
51 51 misc Witness List and Exhibits Fri 05/09 4:39 PM
Amended List of Witnesses and Exhibits Filed by Michael J. Pankow on behalf of Sklarco, LLC Related [+]. (Pankow, Michael)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,38 Order to Reschedule Hearing
50 50 answer Objection Fri 05/09 3:54 PM
Objection Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Loden, Stephen)
Related: [-] 48 Witness List and Exhibits
Att: 1 Defendants' Exhibit C
Att: 2 Defendants' Exhibit H
Att: 3 Defendants' Exhibit K
Att: 4 Defendants' Exhibit L
Att: 5 Defendants' Exhibit M
Att: 6 Defendants' Exhibit N
Att: 7 Defendants' Exhibit P
Att: 8 Defendants' Exhibit R
Att: 9 Defendants' Exhibit V
Att: 10 Defendants' Exhibit X
Att: 11 Defendants' Exhibit Y
Att: 12 Defendants' Exhibit Z
Att: 13 Defendants' Exhibit AA
Att: 14 Defendants' Exhibit BB
Att: 15 Defendants' Exhibit CC
Att: 16 Defendants' Exhibit DD
Att: 17 Defendants' Exhibit EE
Thursday, May 08, 2025
49 49 misc Witness List and Exhibits Thu 05/08 1:45 PM
Amended List of Witnesses and Exhibits Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Loden, Stephen)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction