Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:24-bk-51366

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 12
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:24-ap-05080
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kenneth Wayne Gawlik
4039 CR 204
Falls City, TX 78113
Represented By
Kenneth Wayne Gawlik
contact info
Plaintiff
Agnes Ramos
2240 FM 791
Falls City, TX 78113
Represented By
William H. Oliver
Prichard Young, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Saturday, April 19, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/19 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. )(related document(s):8 Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by William H. Oliver for Plaintiff Agnes Ramos. Hearing Scheduled For 5/19/2025 at 10:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.
Thursday, April 17, 2025
9 9 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Thu 04/17 12:47 PM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by William H. Oliver for Plaintiff Agnes Ramos. Hearing Scheduled For 5/19/2025 at 10:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
8 8 motion Summary Judgment (Adversary) Wed 04/16 3:47 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by William H. Oliver for Plaintiff Agnes Ramos. (Oliver, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/15 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Agnes Ramos' Complaint Objecting to Dischargeability of Debt filed by Agnes Ramos (attorney William H. Oliver) against Kenneth Wayne Gawlik. Docket Call Set For 6/2/2025 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 4/14/2025, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/27/2025, Dispositive Motions Due By 4/23/2025. (Order entered on 1/13/2025)) Notice Date 01/15/2025. (Admin.
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Mon 01/13 5:38 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Agnes Ramos' Complaint Objecting to Dischargeability of Debt filed by Agnes Ramos (attorney William H. Oliver) against Kenneth Wayne Gawlik. Docket Call Set For 6/2/2025 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 4/14/2025, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/27/2025, Dispositive Motions Due By 4/23/2025. (Order entered on 1/13/2025) (Castleberry, Deanna
Friday, January 10, 2025
5 5 misc Statement Regarding Consent Fri 01/10 5:58 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by William H. Oliver for Plaintiff Agnes Ramos (Oliver, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/10 9:45 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Kenneth Wayne Gawlik, (White, Morris)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
3 3 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 12/13 3:18 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet filed by William H. Oliver for Plaintiff Agnes Ramos (Oliver, William) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-05080 Complaint filed by Agnes Ramos (attorney William H. Oliver) against Kenneth Wayne Gawlik (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury))). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Fri 12/13 3:14 PM
Summons Issued on Kenneth Wayne Gawlik Answer Due 01/13/2025 (Oliver, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/13 3:14 PM
Adversary case 24-05080 Agnes Ramos' Complaint Objecting to Dischargeability of Debt filed by Agnes Ramos (attorney William H. Oliver) against Kenneth Wayne Gawlik (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury))). (Oliver, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A