New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Andrew B Altenburg Jr
Case #: 1:24-bk-22549
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Plastic Suppliers, Inc.
2400 Marilyn Ln
Columbus, OH 43219-1721
Represented By
Douglas G. Leney
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Stephen M. Packman
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Archer & Greiner PC
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 5:36 PM EDT
Creditor
Ohio Power Company d/b/a AEP Ohio
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Russell R. Johnson, III
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Walter Smith
Creditor
Americas Styrenics
Represented By
Bruce J. Duke
Bruce J. Duke, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Theodore Riegert
Represented By
Karina Pia Lucid
Karina Pia Lucid, Esq., LLC
contact info
Creditor
Dawn Riegert
Represented By
Karina Pia Lucid
Karina Pia Lucid, Esq., LLC
contact info
Creditor
James R Allen
132 Wake Valley Court
Conroe, TX 77304
Represented By
Karina Pia Lucid
Karina Pia Lucid, Esq., LLC
contact info
Creditor
NatureWorks LLC
Represented By
Scott S. Rever
Genova Burns LLC
contact info
Daniel Stolz
Genova Burns LLC
contact info
Creditor
Andrew Hult
10 Kensington Road
Garden City, NY 11530
Creditor
Constellation NewEnergy, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Creditor
BConnected, LLC
Represented By
Brett S. Theisen
Gibbons PC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Brett S. Moore
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman
contact info
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Kelly D. Curtin
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
MidCap Business Credit LLC
Represented By
Gregory Francis Vizza
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Gregory F Vizza
contact info
Other Prof.
SSG Advisors, LLC
300 Barr Habor Drive Suite 420
West Conshohocken, PA 19428
Other Prof.
RK Consultants, LLC
1178 Broadway 3rd Floor 1505
New York, NY 10001
Spec. Counsel
Russell R. Johnson III
Law Firm of Russell R. Johnson III, PLC 2258 Wheatlands Drive
Manakin-Sabot, VA 23103
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Sponder
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info
Samantha Lieb
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
202 202 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 05/01 3:08 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Plastic Suppliers, Inc.. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit b - PSI Financial Statement March 2025
Att: 2 Exhibit c - bank Account Summary March 2025
Att: 3 Exhibit d - KB Operating Account 3669 March 2025
Att: 4 Exhibit d1 - 358618853669_March 31, 2025
Att: 5 Exhibit e - KB Deposit Account 4213 March 2025
Att: 6 Exhibit e1 - 359681504213_March 31, 2025
Att: 7 Exhibit f - Accounts Receviable Aging Reconciliation March 2025
Att: 8 Exhibit f1 - Aged Accounts Receivable 31 March2025
Att: 9 Exhibit g - Account Payable Post-Petition 31March2025
Att: 10 Exhibit i - Schedule of Insider Payments March 2025
Att: 11 Exhibit j - Statement on Insurance Coverages
Att: 12 Exhibit k - Description of Sale of Assets
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
201 201 claims Notice of Withdrawal of Claim Tue 04/29 4:41 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Claim Number 6 Filed by HYG Financial Services, Inc. (eag)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
200 200 misc Support Mon 04/28 11:30 AM
Pursuant to Docketing Error Notice in support of Related [+] filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of SSG Advisors, LLC. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-] 190 Application for Compensation filed by Other Prof. SSG Advisors, LLC
Att: 1 Summary Cover Sheet
Sunday, April 27, 2025
199 199 court BNC Hrg Ntc Aplc for Compensation Mon 04/28 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 494. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
198 198 court BNC Hrg Ntc Aplc for Compensation Mon 04/28 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 494. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
197 197 court BNC Hrg Ntc Aplc for Compensation Mon 04/28 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 494. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
196 196 court BNC Hrg Ntc Aplc for Compensation Mon 04/28 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 494. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
195 195 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 04/26 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
194 194 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 04/26 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
193 193 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 04/26 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
192 192 court Hearing Scheduled (Document) Fri 04/25 3:48 PM
Hearing Scheduled. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 02:00 PM, ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (as)
Related: [-] 190 First Application for Compensation for SSG Advisors, LLC, Consultant, period: 12/20/2024 to 2/6/2025, fee: $605,535.00, expenses: $2,579.93. Filed by SSG Advisors, LLC.
191 191 court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 04/25 3:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/22/2025. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 02:00 PM, ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (as)
Related: [-] 189 First Application for Compensation for Stephen M. Packman, attorney, period: 12/20/2024 to 3/31/2025, fee: $439,044.50, expenses: $20,164.56. Filed by Stephen M. Packman.
court Notice of Docketing Error - Separate Documents Fri 04/25 3:04 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Brett S. Moore. Type of Error: Related documents in a single docket entry must be separate documents/exhibits. Please email the Proposed Order to chambers. In all future filings, documents and exhibits should be filed as separate attachments. For more information, see D.N.J. LBRs 5005-1 and/or 9013-1. (as)
Related: [-] 187 Application for Compensation filed by Other Prof. RK Consultants, LLC
court Notice of Docketing Error - Separate Documents Fri 04/25 3:10 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Brett S. Moore. Type of Error: Related documents in a single docket entry must be separate documents/exhibits. In all future filings, documents and exhibits should be filed as separate attachments. For more information, see D.N.J. LBRs 5005-1 and/or 9013-1. (as)
Related: [-] 188 Application for Compensation
court Notice of Docketing Error Fri 04/25 3:51 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: No /s/ signature on Application and Summary Cover Sheet, filed by Stephen M. Packman. Please correct and refile the Application and Summary Cover Sheet using the Support event found under the Misc. Events category and link to the190 Application for Compensation. (as)
Related: [-] 190 Application for Compensation filed by Other Prof. SSG Advisors, LLC
Thursday, April 24, 2025
190 190 motion Compensation Thu 04/24 3:03 PM
First Application for Compensation for SSG Advisors, LLC, Consultant, period: 12/20/2024 to 2/6/2025, fee: $605,535.00, expenses: $2,579.93. Filed by SSG Advisors, LLC. Objection deadline is 5/1/2025. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Retention Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Time Sheets
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Expense Detail
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
189 189 motion Compensation Thu 04/24 12:06 PM
First Application for Compensation for Stephen M. Packman, attorney, period: 12/20/2024 to 3/31/2025, fee: $439,044.50, expenses: $20,164.56. Filed by Stephen M. Packman. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 02:00 PM (check with court for location).. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fee Application Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Declaration of Stephen M. Packman
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Archer Retention Order
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Detailed Billing Report
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
188 188 motion Compensation Thu 04/24 10:50 AM
First Application for Compensation for Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C., Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 1/8/2025 to 3/31/2025, fee: $185,542.25, expenses: $1,757.00. Filed by Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 02:00 PM, ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden.. (Moore, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
187 187 motion Compensation Thu 04/24 10:45 AM
First Application for Compensation for RK Consultants, LLC, Accountant, period: 1/14/2025 to 3/31/2025, fee: $31,192.00, expenses: $211.00. Filed by RK Consultants, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 02:00 PM, ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden.. (Moore, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service