Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-22549

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Andrew B Altenburg Jr
Case #: 1:24-bk-22550
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Specialty Films, Inc., Debtor
2400 Marilyn Ln
Columbus, OH 43219-1721
Represented By
Stephen M. Packman
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
16 16 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 05/01 3:16 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Mon 03/10 9:13 AM
Remar Related [+]. STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (lgr)
Related: [-] 15 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.
Friday, March 07, 2025
15 15 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Fri 03/07 3:50 PM
Missing Document(s): Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of All Creditors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
court Hearing Held Wed 01/15 11:13 AM
Minute of 1/14/25 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: OSC SATISFIED - COMPLETED DOCUMENTS FILED IN MAIN CASE. Related [+] (har)
Related: [-] 8 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of All Creditors and Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G and H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/22/2024. Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2025 at 10:30 AM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden.
Sunday, January 12, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Mon 01/13 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
13 13 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Fri 01/10 10:49 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/21/2025 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 3/3/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/20/2025. (cmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/30 2:42 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.,2 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.,3 Document filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.,4 Document filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.,5 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.
Saturday, December 28, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 12/29 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
10 10 order Joint Administration Thu 12/26 2:23 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 24-22549 Member Cases: 24-22550 24-22551 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/26/2024. (kvr)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, December 25, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 12/26 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/23 2:34 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.,2 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.,3 Document filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.,4 Document filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.,5 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.
court Notice of Docketing Error Mon 12/23 11:41 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: PDF List of Creditors was not included AND creditors were not uploaded. In the future, all efiled petitions must include a PDF List of Creditors AND a List of Creditors must also be uploaded at the time of filing of the petition. Creditors must be uploaded to the case and a PDF List of Creditors must be filed using the Missing Documents event ASAP, filed by Stephen M. Packman. (def)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.
court Hearing Held Mon 12/23 4:21 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted; Revised OTBS Related [+] (cmf)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-22549 24-22550 24-22551 Filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.
Sunday, December 22, 2024
8 8 order Show Cause Mon 12/23 2:46 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of All Creditors and Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G and H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/22/2024. Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2025 at 10:30 AM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (eag)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Case Assigned Sun 12/22 7:00 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Andrew B. Altenburg, Jr. added to the case. (ad)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Joint Administration Sun 12/22 6:25 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-22549 24-22550 24-22551 Filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 misc Document Sun 12/22 6:00 PM
Document re: Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Document Sun 12/22 5:59 PM
Document re: Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Related [+] filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Specialty Films, Inc.
Att: 1 Resolutions
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Sun 12/22 5:57 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 12/22 5:57 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Stephen M. Packman on behalf of Specialty Films, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 04/21/2025. (Packman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 List of Equity Security Holders