Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-50062

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bkrpcy Judge Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:24-ap-05083
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Etauj Allen, Defendant
11430 Arabette
San Antonio, TX 78245
Represented By
Etauj Allen
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose C. Rodriguez, Plaintiff
ATTN: Randall A. Pulman 2161 NW Military Hwy, Ste. 400
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request (Adversary) Wed 02/26 3:51 PM
AMENDED Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jose C Rodriguez for Plaintiff Jose C. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Jose) Modified on 2/27/2025 (Paez, Daniel). Related document(s)10 Notice of Appearance and Request (Adversary) filed by Plaintiff Jose C. Rodriguez. Modified on 2/27/2025 (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request (Adversary) Wed 02/26 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jose C Rodriguez for Plaintiff Jose C. Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Jose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 02/19 3:17 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff Jose C. Rodriguez (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/06 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 24-05083 Complaint filed by Jose C. Rodriguez (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) against Etauj Allen (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). Docket Call Set For 7/7/2025 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number:669-254-5252 ID: 160 8446 6872 Discovery due 5/5/2025, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/30/2025, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/15/2025. (Order entered on 2/4/2025)) Notice Date 02/06/2025. (Admin.
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/05 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 2/3/2025)
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
6 6 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Tue 02/04 3:39 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-05083 Complaint filed by Jose C. Rodriguez (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) against Etauj Allen (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). Docket Call Set For 7/7/2025 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number:669-254-5252 ID: 160 8446 6872 Discovery due 5/5/2025, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/30/2025, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/15/2025. (Order entered on 2/4/2025) (Mujica, Roxanne
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Mon 02/03 9:00 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 2/3/2025) (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/03 8:57 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Etauj Allen, (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 12/31 4:13 PM
Summons Served on Etauj Allen - served on 12/31/2024 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 12/31 12:13 PM
Summons Issued on Etauj Allen Answer Due 01/30/2025 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/31 12:13 PM
Adversary case 24-05083 Complaint filed by Jose C. Rodriguez (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Etauj Allen (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet