Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-01123

Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Dales
Case #: 1:25-ap-80001
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Climax Construction, LLC
2725 Airview Blvd., Suite 300
Portage, MI 49002
Represented By
Climax Construction, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly M. Hagan
Represented By
Kevin M. Smith
Beadle Smith, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
court Hearing Continued (ADI) Wed 04/23 9:39 AM
Adjourned Hearing Related [+] Adjourned per Order signed 4/18/25. Hearing scheduled 05/23/2025 at 11:00 AM at Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A). (ADI)
Related: [-] 13 Pretrial Conference
Friday, April 18, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order (Generic/Motion) Fri 04/18 1:04 PM
Order to Adjourn Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Pretrial Hearing to be held on 5/23/2025 at 11:00 AM Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A) for. Signed on 4/18/2025 (lmj)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Adjourn/Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan1 Complaint
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 motion Adjourn/Continue Hearing Thu 04/17 7:41 AM
Stipulated Motion to Adjourn/Continue Hearing On Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 13 Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference
Thursday, April 10, 2025
14 14 misc 7026 Disclosures/Discovery Report Thu 04/10 10:17 AM
7026 Disclosures/Discovery Report Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, February 27, 2025
13 13 2 pgs court Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference Thu 02/27 1:21 PM
Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference, Filing Discovery Plan and Scheduling Pretrial Conference. Parties shall meet in person or telephonically at least once on or before the pretrial conference is held to satisfy requirements pursuant to FRBP 7026(f). A report signed by all parties outlining discovery plan shall be filed with the Court on or before 14 days after 7026(f) conference. Signed on: 2/27/2025. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/22/2025 at 11:00 AM at Kalamazoo Courthouse. Court served Order upon interested parties through the BNC. (tas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kelly M. Hagan
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 misc Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons) Wed 02/26 12:00 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Climax Construction, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint,11 Affirmative Defenses
11 11 misc Affirmative Defenses Wed 02/26 11:57 AM
Affirmative Defenses Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Climax Construction, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,10 Answer to Complaint
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/26 11:55 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Climax Construction, LLC. (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 order Extend Time Fri 02/21 3:53 PM
Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond Related [+] Signed on 2/21/2025. (klb)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 motion Extend Time Thu 02/20 3:53 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Summons and Complaint Filed by Defendant Climax Construction, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
7 7 order Extend Time Fri 01/31 1:44 PM
Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond Related [+] Signed on 1/31/2025. (klb)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, January 30, 2025
6 6 misc Jury Demand Thu 01/30 9:51 AM
Jury Demand Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Climax Construction, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
5 5 motion Extend Time Thu 01/30 9:50 AM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Summons and Complaint Filed by Defendant Climax Construction, LLC (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 appr Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices Thu 01/30 9:47 AM
Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Climax Construction, LLC. (Rogalski, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 01/07 11:08 AM
Summons Service Executed on Climax Construction, LLC 1/7/2025 (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 01/06 2:03 PM
Summons Issued on Climax Construction, LLC Date Issued 1/6/2025, Answer Due 2/5/2025 (jaz)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 2:58 PM
Adversary case 25-80001 11 Related [+]) 12) : Complaint by Kelly M. Hagan against Climax Construction, LLC. Fee Amount of $350 is DEFERRED with Request to Defer by Plaintiff. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - 547 preference