Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20245

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher M Klein
Case #: 2:25-ap-02001
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hillary Chhlang
5850 E. Ashley Lane
Stockton, CA 95212
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Swift Financial, LLC
Represented By
Daren M. Schlecter
Law Office Of Daren M. Schlecter
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
17 17 misc Substitution of Attorney (Pro Se to Attorney or Attorney to Attorney Within the Law Firm) Mon 04/21 10:21 AM
Substitution of Attorney. Eric L. Seyvertsen for Hillary Chhlang Substituted in. Filed by Defendant Hillary Chhlang (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Wed 03/26 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
15 15 notice BNC Service of Document Mon 03/24 8:52 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 22, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Mon 03/24 8:50 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/12/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C Discovery due by 9/19/2025. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 misc Matter Held * Thu 03/20 11:56 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference removed from calendar. [CAE-1] Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) : Complaint 25-02001 by Swift Financial, LLC against Hillary Chhlang. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7442256) (pdes)Modified on 1/13/2025 (pdes). (auto)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
12 12 misc Discovery Plan Tue 03/04 9:27 AM
Joint Discovery Plan Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Hillary Chhlang, Plaintiff Swift Financial, LLC (vcaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/27 12:55 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Hillary Chhlang. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
virtual Change of Address by Attorney Tue 02/25 1:56 PM
On 2/25/2025, Change of Address Submitted for Attorney Ruth Auerbach through Pacer Service Center. Address changed to: 236 West Portal Avenue Suite 185 San Francisco CA 94127. IF YOUR CLIENT IS RECEIVING MAIL AT YOUR ADDRESS, IT IS YOUR RESPONSIBILITY TO SUBMIT A CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM (EDC 2-085)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
10 10 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Tue 02/25 9:33 AM
Order Granting9 Stipulation ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 02/14 8:10 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Hillary Chhlang, Plaintiff Swift Financial, LLC (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Tue 01/14 10:05 AM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program,5 Order to Confer (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 misc Reissued Summons Mon 01/13 1:44 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; to be held on 3/19/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (pdes)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Reissued Summons Mon 01/13 10:34 AM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; to be held on 3/19/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (pdes)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 01/13 9:55 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (pdes) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2025 (Starr, Maggie)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 01/13 9:54 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (pdes) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2025 (Starr, Maggie)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 01/13 9:54 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 3/19/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (pdes)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 12, 2025
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 01/13 9:53 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 01/13 9:53 AM
(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) : Complaint 25-02001 by Swift Financial, LLC against Hillary Chhlang. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7442256) (pdes)Modified on 1/13/2025 (pdes)
Related: [-]