Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-10047

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:25-bk-10063
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TransWorld Travel, Inc.
10800 Pecan Park Blvd Ste 400
Austin, TX 78750-1477
Represented By
Shella Borovinskaya
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Friday, February 28, 2025
5 5 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Fri 02/28 10:54 AM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch E-F, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by TransWorld Travel, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 02/14 11:36 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. REDACTED Filed by TransWorld Travel, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SOFA
3 3 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 02/14 8:31 AM
[SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by TransWorld Travel, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 order Order-Joint Admin Thu 01/16 5:33 PM
Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases" Order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mondee Holdings, Inc., et al. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mondee Holdings, Inc., Case No. 25-10047 (JKS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case." Signed on 1/16/2025 (AJL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
court Case Assigned Wed 01/15 8:43 AM
Judge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
1 1 54 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 01/14 11:14 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by TransWorld Travel, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 01/14 11:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-10063 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11980862, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]