Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:25-bk-10047
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mondee Holdings, Inc.
1800 Pecan Park Blvd. Suite 400
Austin, TX 78750
Represented By
Rachel C. Strickland
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Erin C. Ryan
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Michael P. Sternheim
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Andrew S. Mordkoff
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Geoffrey S. Berman
contact info
Shella Borovinskaya
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Amanda Fang
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Andrew M Lee
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Nicole R. Love
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Edmon L. Morton
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Anne Aufhauser
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Timothy R. Powell
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Cameron J. Cavalier
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 8:26 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
www.kroll.com/kra 1 World Trade Center 31st Floor
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
contact info
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
Lucy L Thomson
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
Lucy L Thompson
The Willard 1455 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. Suite 400
Washington, DC 20004
Creditor
Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C.
Represented By
Barbra R Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Abraham Shabot Cherem
Represented By
Trent L Rosenthal
contact info
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Creditor
Jose Luis Castro Gomez
Represented By
Trent L Rosenthal
contact info
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Creditor
Judith Guerra Aguijosa
Represented By
Trent L Rosenthal
contact info
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Creditor
M4 Pecan Park, LLC
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Air India Limited
Represented By
Barbra R Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Travelport, LP and Travelport International Operations Limited
Represented By
Drew McGehrin
C/o Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Creditor
The County of Williamson, Texas
McCreary Veselka Bragg & Allen PC Attn: Julie Anne Parsons PO Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Julie Anne Parsons
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg, & Allen, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
JC & Braham, S.A.P.I. de C.V.
Represented By
Trent L Rosenthal
contact info
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Creditor
SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT AND CITY OF HOUSTON
Represented By
Melissa E. Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, a Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson, Esq. 425 Market St., Suite 2900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Mark Magnozzi
The Magnozzi Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
James E. Huggett
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter PC
contact info
Benjamin Rachelson
The Magnozzi Law Firm PC
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John Kendrick Turner 3500 Maple Avenue Suite 800
Dallas, TX 75219
Represented By
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Carrollton-Farmers Branch ISD
Represented By
Linda D. Reece
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Amadeus North America, Inc.
3470 NW 82 Avenue
Miami, FL 33178
Represented By
David R Softness
David R. Softness, PA
contact info
Creditor
Airlines Reporting Corporation
Represented By
Siena Cerra
Morris James LLP
contact info
Tara C Pakrouh
Morris James LLP
contact info
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Patrick A. Jackson
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Prasad Gundumogula
Represented By
Bojan Guzina
White & Case LLP
contact info
Andrew K. Gershenfeld
White & Case LLP
contact info
Brian E Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Don Mago
White & Case LLP
contact info
Jason Zakia
White & Case LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Interested Party
George Perdikakis, on his own behalf as and personal representative for Greek employees
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Diana Krepinsky Rodrigues
Represented By
Amanda R. Steele
Richards, Layton And Finger
contact info
Interested Party
Cynthia Sherry Ann Krepinsky Rodrigues
Represented By
Amanda R. Steele
Richards, Layton And Finger
contact info
Interested Party
TCW Asset Management Company LLC and Mondee Purchaser, LLC
Represented By
Richard Scott Cobb
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Wingspire Capital LLC
Represented By
Jennifer K Malow
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Lawrence Raymond Thomas, III
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Cassandra Mott
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Stanley B. Tarr
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
John E Lucian
contact info
Regina Stango Kelbon
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Tuesday Investor LP
Represented By
Deborah J. Newman
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Zachary Russell
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Mohit Agarwal
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Lindsay M. Weber
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Gregg M. Galardi
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Robert Alan Weber
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Daniel G. Egan
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Benjamin I. Finestone
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Roose
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Cameron Kelly
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
TCW Asset Management Company LLC
Represented By
William D. Dalsen
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Charles A. Dale
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Michael T Mervis
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Dylan J. Marker
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A. Rogers
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Richard Scott Cobb
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Schulte Roth and Zabel LLP
Represented By
Reuben E. Dizengoff
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Adam C. Harris
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Origami Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By
Frank Hastings Griffin
Grant & Eisenhofer, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
FLY OCP LLC
Represented By
Frank Hastings Griffin
Grant & Eisenhofer, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew R. Brooks
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Tori Lynn Remington
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Jonathan Lipshie
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
603 603 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Fri 05/02 4:18 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC for the period March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Mondee Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-] 566
602 602 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Fri 05/02 4:17 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Second Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses of Piper Sandler & Co. for the period March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Mondee Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-] 564
601 601 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Fri 05/02 4:15 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Second Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Mondee Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-] 563
Thursday, May 01, 2025
600 600 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Thu 05/01 8:39 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Third Monthly and Final Fee Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel for the Debtors for the Monthly Period from April 1, 2025, through April 11, 2025, and the Final Period from January 14, 2025, through and Including the Dismissal Effective Date, Third Monthly and Final Application of Reed Smith LLP, as Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Monthly Period from April 1, 2025, through April 11, 2025, and for the Final Period from January 14, 2025, through and Including the Dismissal Effective Date, Third Monthly and Final Fee Application of Piper Sandler & Co. for Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses as Investment Banker to the Debtors for the Monthly Period from April 1, 2025, through and Including April 3, 2025, and the Final Period from January 14, 2025, through and Including April 3, 2025, Monthly and Final Fee Application of Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for (I) the Monthly Period from April 1, 2025 through April 11, 2025, and (II) the Final Period from January 14, 2025 through Entry of the Final Dismissal Order, and Second Monthly Staffing and Compensation Report of M3 Advisory Partners, LP for the Period from March 1, 2025 through April 11, 2025 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 578 ,579 ,580 ,581 ,582
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
599 599 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 8:34 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Debtors, Mondee Purchaser, LLC And Victor And Sherly Abraham (i) Granting An Extension Of Time For Parties To Resolve Cure Objection And (II) Granting Related Relie Related [+] Order Signed on 4/30/2025. (AJL)
Related: [-] 589
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
598 598 11 pgs motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 04/29 8:02 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Reject an Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property, and (II) Abandon Personal Property, Effective as of the Rejection Effective Date Filed by Mondee Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/13/2025. (Powell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
597 597 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 04/29 7:28 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Amy Castillo Regarding Second Monthly Application of Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP, as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period from February 1, 2025 Through February 28, 2025 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 574
596 596 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 04/29 3:26 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Debtors' Motion for an Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1452, and Debtors' Motion for an Order Extending the Deadline for the Debtors to Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Under Which Any of the Debtors is a Lessee . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 569 ,570
595 595 order Extend Time Tue 04/29 12:05 PM
Order Extending the Deadline for the Debtors to Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Under Which Any of the Debtors is a Lessee Related [+] Order Signed on 4/29/2025. (AJL)
Related: [-] 570 570
594 594 order Extend Time Tue 04/29 12:03 PM
Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452 Related [+] Order Signed on 4/29/2025. (AJL)
Related: [-] 569 569
Monday, April 28, 2025
593 593 misc Certificate of No Objection Mon 04/28 4:54 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion to Extend the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452 Related [+] Filed by Mondee Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-] 569
592 592 misc Certificate of No Objection Mon 04/28 4:53 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion to Extend the Deadline for the Debtors to Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Under Which Any of the Debtors is a Lessee Related [+] Filed by Mondee Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-] 570
591 591 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 04/28 4:28 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Alain B. Francoeur Regarding First Monthly Staffing and Compensation Report of M3 Advisory Partners, LP for the Period from January 14, 2025 through February 28, 2025 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 557
590 590 misc Statement of Professionals' Compensation Mon 04/28 3:20 PM
Statement of Professionals' Compensation - Notice of Filing of First Quarterly Statement of Amounts Paid to Ordinary Course Professionals for the Period From January 14, 2025 Through and Including March 31, 2025 Filed by Mondee Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
589 589 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 04/25 6:46 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Between the Debtors, Mondee Purchaser, LLC, and Victor and Sherly Abraham (I) Granting an Extension of Time for Parties to Resolve Cure Objection and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Mondee Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-] 512
588 588 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 04/25 5:24 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Second Monthly Fee Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel for the Debtors for the Period from March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025, Second Monthly Fee Application of Piper Sandler & Co. for Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses as Investment Banker to the Debtors from March 1, 2025 through and Including March 31, 2025, and Monthly Fee Application of Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 563 ,564 ,566
587 587 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 04/25 5:16 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Initial Order (I) Dismissing the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases, (II) Establishing Procedures and a Deadline for Filing Final Chapter 11 Fee Applications, and (III) Granting Related Relief . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 572
586 586 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 04/25 3:38 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Notice of Closing of Sale of Assets . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 550