Cosmopolitan Travel Services Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-10047
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-10047
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | J Kate Stickles |
Case #: | 1:25-bk-10065 |
Case Filed: | Jan 14, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Cosmopolitan Travel Services Inc.
248 W 35th St Rm 501
New York, NY 10001-2505 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch E-F, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Cosmopolitan Travel Services Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. REDACTED Filed by Cosmopolitan Travel Services Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() [SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Cosmopolitan Travel Services Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases" Order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mondee Holdings, Inc., et al. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mondee Holdings, Inc., Case No. 25-10047 (JKS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case." Signed on 1/16/2025 (AJL) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/15 7:52 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-10065 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11980975, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Case Assigned
Wed 01/15 8:43 AM
Judge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH) |
||
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Cosmopolitan Travel Services Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) |