Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03126

Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 2:25-cv-00006
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 2:35 AM MST
Defendant
Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant
Snowflake, Inc.
Represented By
Brent Richard Bihr
Holland & Hart, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ticketmaster, LLC
Plaintiff
Collegedale Credit Union
Represented By
Domenic A. Cossi
Western Justice Associates
contact info
Joseph P Guglielmo
Scott & Scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
Adam M. Shaw
Western Justice Associates, PLLC
contact info
Erin Green Comite
Scott&scott, Attorneys At Law, LLP
contact info
Gary F Lynch
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Andrew Stanko, I
Scott And Scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Financial Horizons Credit Union
Represented By
Domenic A. Cossi
Western Justice Associates
contact info
Joseph P Guglielmo
Scott & Scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
Adam M. Shaw
Western Justice Associates, PLLC
contact info
Erin Green Comite
Scott&scott, Attorneys At Law, LLP
contact info
Gary F Lynch
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Andrew Stanko, I
Scott And Scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, February 17, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/17 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union, Omaha Federal Credit Union Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM, 2:25-cv-00008-BMM (Guglielmo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
26 26 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/14 5:06 PM
ORDER re (13 in 2:25-cv-00008-BMM, 345 in 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 25 in 2:25-cv-00006-BMM). It is hereby ORDERED: 1. The Leadership Structure (Doc. 255) is modified as follows: a. A Financial Institution spoke shall be created. b. James Pizzirusso and Domenic A. Cossi shall be appointed as Co- Lead Counsel for the Financial Institution spoke. c. The parties shall amend the current Leadership Structure and identify the responsibilities of the Financial Institution spoke. d. Co-Lead Counsel shall reassign Bill Rossbach and J. Devlan Geddes, to a position it sees fit. 2. FI Plaintiffs shall file a representative complaint by March 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/14/2025. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM, 2:25-cv-00008-BMM (ACC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
25 25 motion Supplement - MT Thu 02/13 5:24 PM
MOTION to Supplement . Domenic A. Cossi appearing for Plaintiff Omaha Federal Credit Union. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM, 2:25-cv-00008-BMM (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Collegedale Declaration,
Att: 2 Affidavit Financial Horizons Declaration,
Att: 3 Affidavit Lynch Declaration,
Att: 4 Affidavit Omaha Declaration,
Att: 5 Affidavit Simon Declaration
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Richard Bihr on behalf of Snowflake Inc, Snowflake, Inc., Snowflake, Inc. Data Security Breach Litigation Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM et al. (Bihr, Brent)
Related: [-]
23 23 utility Notice of Correction - MT Tue 02/04 9:22 AM
Notice of Correction: re 321 in 2:24-md-03126-BMM, Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings re AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, and Cricket Wireless, LLC . The filing error relates to: Consolidated Cases. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM et al. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 motion Stay Mon 02/03 6:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings re AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, and Cricket Wireless, LLC . Mark Williams appearing for Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc., MDL - Notice Only AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Cricket Wireless, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM et al. (Williams, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/03 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gary F Lynch on behalf of Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union, Collegedale Credit Union, Omaha Federal Credit Union, Omaha Federal Credit Union Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM, 2:25-cv-00008-BMM (Lynch, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 01/24 7:56 AM
ORDER denying 302 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying [304)] Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 2:24-md-03126-BMM; denying (13) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 2:25-cv-00005-BMM; denying (18) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 2:25-cv-00006-BMM. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/24/2025. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00005-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM (ACC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
19 19 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Wed 01/22 7:11 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re (18 in 2:25-cv-00006-BMM) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Separate Tracks and Appointment of Leadership for the Financial Institution Track filed by Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. 1 Midwest Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. 2 Home Depot Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. 3 Equifax Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. 4 Guglielmo Bio and Resume,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. 5 Lynch Bio,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh. 6 Lynch Carpenter Resume,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh. 7 Cossi Bio,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh. 8 WJA Resume
18 18 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 01/22 7:06 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Separate Tracks and Appointment of Leadership for the Financial Institution Track . Domenic A. Cossi appearing for Plaintiffs Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT Wed 01/22 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Joseph Guglielmo by Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM (Cossi, Domenic) Modified on 1/22/2025 to add text (ACC)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT Wed 01/22 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Erin Comite by Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM (Cossi, Domenic) Modified on 1/22/2025 to add text(ACC)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT Wed 01/22 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Andrew Stanko by Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM, 2:25-cv-00006-BMM (Cossi, Domenic) Modified on 1/22/2025 to add text (ACC)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/22 11:08 AM
Terminate Deadlines as to14 Acknowledgments of Pro Hac by Counsel Guglielmo, Comite and Stanko; filed. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT Tue 01/21 10:05 AM
ORDER granting10 ,11 &12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Joseph P. Guglielmo, Erin G. Comite, and Andrew Stanko. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/21/2025. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
13 13 misc Transcript Order Form - SDM Fri 01/17 3:58 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Advance Auto Parts, Inc. for proceedings held on January 9, 2025 before Judge Brian Morris. Court reporter JoAnn Jett Corson. Type of transcript: 30-Day. Transcript due by 1/22/2025. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM et al. (Jones, Natasha)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT Fri 01/17 2:32 PM
MOTION Andrew Stanko to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3405196.). Domenic A. Cossi appearing for Plaintiffs Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union. (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT Fri 01/17 2:28 PM
MOTION Erin G. Comite to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3405193.). Domenic A. Cossi appearing for Plaintiffs Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union. (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT Fri 01/17 2:16 PM
MOTION Joseph P. Guglielmo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3405168.). Domenic A. Cossi appearing for Plaintiffs Collegedale Credit Union, Financial Horizons Credit Union. (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/17 2:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Collegedale Credit Union. (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/17 2:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Financial Horizons Credit Union. (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/17 4:32 PM
Terminate Deadlines as to Transcript Order filed by N. Jones. Transcript Order should not have been spread to each individual action. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM et al. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 01/16 8:30 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Live Nation Entertainment,
Att: 2 Snowflake
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
6 6 utility MDL Notice to Counsel Wed 01/15 4:22 PM
COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Snowflake, Inc., Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 24-3126 Counsel should read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in the master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 2:24-md-3126-BMM. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the[LINK:Snowflake, Inc. Data Breach MDL website page] . Attorneys not admitted to the federal bar for the District of Montana must request pro hac vice e-filing access to the District of Montana CM/ECF system through PACER and then electronically file a motion to proceed pro hac vice in this matter. Once the pro hac vice motion has been granted, counsel shall file a notice of appearance in the master docket. Instructions for submitting an MDL Attorney E-Filing Registration request in PACER can be found[LINK:here] . If you have any questions please contact the MDL docket clerk at 406-727-1922. (MMS)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Remark Wed 01/15 4:21 PM
Remark: Remark: Per the Transfer Order in 2:24-md-3126, this matter has been consolidated for pretrial proceedings to proceed in MDL No. 3126, In re: Snowflake, Inc., Data Security Breach Litigation. All documents shall be filed in the master MDL case 2:24-md-3126 and spread to the docket for the individual cases to which the document pertains. If the document relates to all actions spread the filing to all individual actions. If you have questions regarding this filing process contact the MDL docket clerk at 406-727-1922. (MMS)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Wed 01/15 3:45 PM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to Ticketmaster, LLC, re1 Complaint (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Wed 01/15 3:44 PM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to Snowflake, Inc., re1 Complaint (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Wed 01/15 3:43 PM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., re1 Complaint (Cossi, Domenic)
Related: [-]
1 1 71 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Wed 01/15 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Snowflake, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, filed by Financial Horizons Credit Union, Collegedale Credit Union. (KJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 01/15 3:24 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3403180 (KJC)
Related: [-]