District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-00016
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Terminated:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:05 AM EST
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff
MICHAEL DUKE REEVES
621 E State Ave.
High Point, NC 27262


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/25 1:58 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5149 for14 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by MICHAEL DUKE REEVES. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
15 15 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 04/24 4:11 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court or motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis has been decided re14 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Thu 04/24 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to10 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, by MICHAEL DUKE REEVES. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
12 12 order Leave to File Denied Tue 04/22 9:59 AM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's Motion to Suppress This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "Leave to file DENIED. Filer is not a party in or otherwise affiliated with the above-numbered civil action.". Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/18/2025. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 05, 2025
13 13 misc Request for Leave to File Review Tue 04/22 3:32 PM
REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE REVIEW. The attached document requires leave to file: Plaintiff's Motion to Discharge and Expungement of Records. Reason(s): Case is closed. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 misc Request for Leave to File Review Tue 04/22 9:40 AM
REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE REVIEW. The attached document requires leave to file: MICHAEL DUKE REEVES; Motion for Reconsideration. Reason(s): Document is not signed. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Pro Se Case Wed 02/26 11:39 AM
ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/25/2025. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
misc Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Thu 01/16 2:04 PM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/2/2025. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmtm)
Related: [-]