Original Case: 1:25-cv-00016

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05149
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
United States of America
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michael Duke Reeves
Represented By
Michael Duke Reeves
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 5:14 AM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5149
Related: [-]
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2113036] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.9589 0710 5270 2357 2525 08] of order [2112961-4], [2112949-5]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/27/2025 from Michael Duke Reeves. 25-5149
Related: [-]
8 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2112940] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:25-cv-00016-UNA filed by Michael Duke Reeves. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5149 25-5149
Related: [-]
CLERK'S ORDER [2112949] filed directing party to file payment of docketing fee APPELLANT payment of docketing fee due 05/27/2025; directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis APPELLANT motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court due 05/27/2025. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 25-5149
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Order Sent
Att: 2 7 pgs Form Sent
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2112961] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/16/2025. APPENDIX due 06/16/2025. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 25-5149
Related: [-]