Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:M Hannah Lauck
Case #: 3:25-cv-00040
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 5:33 AM EST
Defendant
Chavis
Defendant
Pamunkey Regional Jail
Plaintiff
King Miguel Eddie Crayton


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 04/02 3:45 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1329 Case Manager, GAboutabl, for8 Notice of Appeal filed by King Miguel Eddie Crayton. (Lgar, )
Related: [-]
appeal Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA Wed 04/02 3:54 PM
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re8 Notice of Appeal 25-1329 (Lgar, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
9 9 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA Tue 04/01 10:22 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re8 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Lgar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 03/31 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by King Miguel Eddie Crayton.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/06 2:32 PM
FINAL ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Mr. Crayton does not request, and the Court does not grant, leave to amend, rendering this order final and appealable. Mr. Crayton is advised that he has the right to appeal the decision of the Court. Should he wish to do so, written notice of appeal must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof Failure to file a written notice of appeal may result in the loss of the right to appeal. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/6/2025. (Copy of Memorandum Opinion and Final Order sent to Mr. Crayton via email as directed.)(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Thu 03/06 2:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/6/2025. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
5 5 cmp Complaint Wed 02/19 12:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chavis, Pamunkey Regional Jail, filed by King Miguel Eddie Crayton.(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
Thursday, February 13, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/13 10:07 AM
ORDER that the Application is GRANTED (ECF No.1 ). Mr. Crayton may proceed in this case in forma pauperis , i.e., without paying the Court's filing fees and costs. The Court hereby ORDERS that, no later than March 13, 2025, Mr. Crayton shall file an Amended Complaint, with a Ghostwriting Form attached, which outlines in simple and straightforward terms why Mr. Crayton thinks that he is entitled to relief and why the Court has jurisdiction over his case. Mr. Crayton is ADVISED that the failure to strictly comply with the Court's directives and with applicable rules will result in DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to send a copy of this Order and a copy of the Ghostwriting Form to Mr. Crayton to his email address of record. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 02/13/2025. Copy of Order and Ghostwriting Form emailed to Mr. Crayton. (Kski, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing Mon 02/10 9:41 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 2/10/2025. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
2 2 motion Pro Se E-Noticing Tue 01/21 2:02 PM
MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by King Miguel Eddie Crayton. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/21 2:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by King Miguel Eddie Crayton.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Local Rule 83.1(N) Certification