Original Case: 3:25-cv-00040

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.pr-01329
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
PAMUNKEY REGIONAL JAIL
Defendant - Appellee
CHAVIS, S.G.T. Officer Correction
Plaintiff - Appellant
KING MIGUEL EDDIE CRAYTON
Represented By
King Miguel Eddie Crayton
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 4:19 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:25-cv-00040-MHL. Case manager: GAboutabl. [1001746641] 25-1329 GMA [Entered: 04/02/2025 09:06 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: King Miguel Eddie Crayton. [1001746658] Informal Opening Brief due 04/28/2025. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 25-1329 GMA [Entered: 04/02/2025 09:24 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001746661]. Due: 04/16/2025. 25-1329 GMA [Entered: 04/02/2025 09:29 AM]
Related: [-]