Original Case: 1:21-cv-00067

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.co-01085
Typecivil copyright / private
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 4:25 AM EST
Defendant
DMARC ADVISOR BV, f/k/a Dmarcian Europe BV
Party-in-Interest - Appellant
PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Represented By
David N. Allen
ALLEN, CHESSON & GRIMES PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DMARCIAN, INC.
Represented By
Tyler Charles Jameson
ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP
contact info
Pamela Suzanne Duffy
ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP
contact info
David Anthony Dorey
BLANK ROME LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/29/2025 3:16 AM EST
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
1 1 1 pgs Civil copyright case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00067-MR. Date notice of appeal filed: 01/28/2025. Case manager: TBarton. [1001710268] 25-1085 TB [Entered: 01/28/2025 02:49 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] civil copyright case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00067-MR. [1001710272] 25-1085 TB [Entered: 01/28/2025 02:51 PM]
Related: [-]