Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-33553

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:24-ap-03279
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: never
Counter-Claimant
Alexander E Jones
Represented By
Jose Antonio Ortiz
Jordan & Ortiz, PC
contact info
Shelby A Jordan
Jordan & Ortiz, PC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Julian Soto Marino
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Erica Ash
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Williams Aldenberg
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Jacqueline Barden
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Mark Barden
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Jennifer Hensel
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Ian Hockley
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Nicole Hockley
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Carlee Soto Parisi
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Robert Parker
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
William Sherlach
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Carlos M Soto
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Donna Soto
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
David Wheeler
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Francine Wheeler
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alexander E Jones
Represented By
Jose Antonio Ortiz
Jordan & Ortiz, PC
contact info
Shelby A Jordan
Jordan & Ortiz, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos M Soto
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Erica Ash
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Parker
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wiliam Sherlach
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Williams Aldenberg
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Julian Soto Marino
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlee Soto Parisi
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Soto
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Hensel
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ian Hockley
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Hockley
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Barden
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Barden
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Francine Wheeler
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Wheeler
Represented By
Ryan E Chapple
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Bethany G Gingras
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
court Hearing Cont Tue 05/06 2:39 PM
Hearing Continued on Related [+]. The Hybrid Status Conference scheduled for 5/9/2025 is cancelled and reset to 6/5/2025 at 01:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (rgs4)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
court Hearing Set Tue 04/29 4:12 PM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. Hybrid Status Conference scheduled for 5/9/2025 at 01:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (rgs4)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, April 17, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/17 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Generic Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Tue 04/15 4:22 PM
Order Granting the Connecticut Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion Extending the Connecticut Plaintiffs' Reply Deadline to the Defendant's Response to the Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. Signed on 4/15/2025. (rgs4)
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
24 24 answer Reply Wed 03/26 6:41 PM
Reply to Alexander E. Jones's Response to the Connecticut Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. Filed by Williams Aldenberg, Erica Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Julian Soto Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, Wiliam Sherlach, Carlos M Soto, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-] 20 Generic Motion
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
23 23 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/19 7:22 PM
Non-Opposition Motion Extending the Connecticut Plaintiffs' Reply Deadline to the Defendant's Response to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Williams Aldenberg, Erica Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Julian Soto Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, Wiliam Sherlach, Carlos M Soto, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
22 22 notice Notice Thu 03/13 1:36 PM
Notice of Attorney Unavailability . Filed by Alexander E Jones (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
21 21 answer Response Wed 03/12 11:27 PM
Response to Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. Filed by Alexander E Jones (Broocks, Ben)
Related: [-] 20 Generic Motion
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
20 20 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 02/19 5:50 PM
Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b) AND FRBP 7012(b) [Related to ECF Nos. 8 and 11] Filed by Williams Aldenberg, Erica Ash, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Julian Soto Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, Wiliam Sherlach, Carlos M Soto, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
19 19 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 8:34 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE - This action was16 transferred from the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 157(a) and the court's General Order of Reference (General Order 2012-6) this action is REFERRED to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas...*** Case terminated on 1/24/25. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (sra4)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 8:33 PM
CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (bmn4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
17 17 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 8:11 PM
Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 1:24-cv-01198; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
16 16 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 8:09 PM
ORDER; IT IS ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 8:08 PM
STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES AND CONSISTENT THEREWITH GRANTING THE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OF CASE NO. 1:24-cv-1198 by William Sherlach, Carlos M Soto, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler, Julian Soto Marino, Williams Aldenberg, Robert Parker, Erica Lafferty, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Nicole Hockley, Ian Hockley, Jennifer Hensel, Carlee Soto Parisi. (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
14 14 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 8:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by William Sherlach, Carlos M Soto, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler, Julian Soto Marino, Williams Aldenberg, Robert Parker, Erica Lafferty, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Nicole Hockley, Ian Hockley, Jennifer Hensel, Carlee Soto Parisi, re10 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case To The Southern District of Texas ("Home Court") Where The First Filed Action Dealing With The Same Claims and Same Litigants Is Pending filed by Alexander E. Jones (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 7:58 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by William Sherlach, Carlos M Soto, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler, Julian Soto Marino, Williams Aldenberg, Robert Parker, Erica Lafferty, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Nicole Hockley, Ian Hockley, Jennifer Hensel, Carlee Soto Parisi, re 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carlos M Soto, Ian Hockley, Jacqueline Barden, William Sherlach, Carlee Soto Parisi, Julian Soto Marino, Robert Parker, Jennifer Hensel, Mark Barden, Erica Lafferty, David Wheeler, Donna Soto, Francine Wheeler, Williams Aldenberg, Nicole Hockle (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, November 15, 2024
12 12 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 7:44 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Alexander E. Jones, re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carlos M Soto, Ian Hockley, Jacqueline Barden, William Sherlach, Carlee Soto Parisi, Julian Soto Marino, Robert Parker, Jennifer Hensel, Mark Barden, Erica Lafferty, David Wheeler, Donna Soto, Francine Wheeler, Williams Aldenberg, Nicole Hockle (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
11 11 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 7:33 PM
AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs amending 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim., filed by Alexander E. Jones (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, November 08, 2024
10 10 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 7:19 PM
Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case To The Southern District of Texas ("Home Court") Where The First Filed Action Dealing With The Same Claims and Same Litigants Is Pending by Alexander E. Jones.(Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
9 9 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 7:13 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Williams Aldenberg, Jacqueline Barden, Mark Barden, Jennifer Hensel, Ian Hockley, Nicole Hockley, Erica Lafferty, Julian Soto Marino, Carlee Soto Parisi, Robert Parker, William Sherlach, Carlos M Soto, Donna Soto, David Wheeler, Francine Wheeler (Gingras, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, October 28, 2024
8 8 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 7:09 PM
Alex Jones's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses Subject Thereto, and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Alexander E. Jones. (Jordan, Shelby) (Entered 10/28/2024)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
7 7 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 6:55 PM
Amended NOTICE of Removal by Alexander E. Jones re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Alexander E. Jones.(Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
6 6 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Amended Index of Matters Being Filed by Alexander E. Jones re1 Notice of Removal, (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Document (Adversary) Wed 01/29 12:42 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal, by Alexander E. Jones. (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 11:30 AM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Entry (Adversary) Wed 01/29 11:26 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re1 Notice of Removal, the Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet is not attached. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Document (Adversary) Wed 01/29 11:11 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Alexander E. Jones. (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal [system event] Tue 01/28 3:59 PM
Adversary case 24-03279 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alexander E. Jones (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19316310), filed by Alexander E. Jones.(Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]