Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:William M Conley
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:25-cv-00068
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:36 AM CDT
Defendant
National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By
Thomas L. Shriner, Jr.
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
David J Wenthold
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Kate Gehl
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Max Steven Meckstroth
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nyzier Fourqurean
Represented By
Michael Patrick Crooks
Von Briesen & Roper, S.C.
contact info

GPO Feb 06 2025
ORDER Granting Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/6/2025. (Watson, Nathan)
GPO Feb 06 2025
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/6/2025. (Watson, Nathan)

Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
48 48 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/19 1:57 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties have filed a joint motion for extension of time, Dkt.47 , asking to extend the defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. For good cause, that request is GRANTED in large part. Defendant's deadline is extended to thirty days after the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals issues its decision on this court's injunction order. Once the appeal is concluded, this court will set a preliminary pretrial conference in this case, if appropriate, and the parties' deadline for meeting and conferring and submitting a joint report will be set according to the date of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 3/19/2025. (rks)
Related: [-]
47 47 motion Extension of Time Wed 03/19 9:39 AM
Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Sunday, February 16, 2025
46 46 appeal Transcript Request Form Sun 02/16 4:06 PM
Transcript Request Form by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association (Wenthold, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
45 45 misc Transcript Wed 02/12 3:23 PM
Updated Copy of43 Transcript of Motion Hearing, held February 4, 2025 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: PH. Please review the court's policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see[LINK:Electronic Transcript Instructions] . (rks)
Related: [-]
44 44 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/12 9:52 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. National Collegiate Athletic Association waiver sent on 2/10/2025, answer due 4/11/2025. (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
43 43 misc Transcript Mon 02/10 8:51 AM
Transcript of Motion Hearing, held February 4, 2025 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: PH. Please review the court's policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see[LINK:Electronic Transcript Instructions] . (rks)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Information Packet Mon 02/10 8:23 AM
[LINK:Appeal Information Packet] attached. (nln)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
42 42 appeal Transmission of Short Record to Seventh Circuit Fri 02/07 12:48 PM
Transmission of Short Record to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re:41 Notice of Appeal, (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order,
Att: 2 Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 3 Docket Sheet
41 41 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 02/07 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL - INTERLOCUTORY by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association as to40 Preliminary Injunction,39 Order. Filing fee of $ 605, receipt number AWIWDC-3560671 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 02/07 4:21 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1187 for41 Notice of Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (rks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
40 40 order Preliminary Injunction Thu 02/06 7:20 PM
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/6/2025. (Watson, Nathan)
Related: [-]
39 39 22 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 7:17 PM
ORDER Granting Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/6/2025. (Watson, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
38 38 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 5:38 PM
Declaration of Marcus Sedberry filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 4:23 PM
Second Declaration of Jerry Vaughn filed by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association re:2 Motion for TRO (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Waiver Request,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Case ID 1234044 Communications,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Case ID 1234044 Screenshot,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Fourqurean Statement,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Case ID 1234044 Call Notes,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Case ID 1234044 Case Assessment and Triage File,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Case ID 1234044 Additional Statements,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Case ID 1234044 Document History
36 36 motion Strike Wed 02/05 2:15 PM
Motion to Strike25 Declaration,30 Declaration and 25-1 Exhibit by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. Brief in Opposition due 2/19/2025. Brief in Reply due 2/26/2025. (Gehl, Kate) Modified on 2/5/2025: Linked to25 . (lak)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:50 AM
Declaration of Chadler Swoope filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:49 AM
Declaration of Cody Tierney filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:48 AM
Declaration of Jim Louis filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:47 AM
Declaration of Maceo Tillman filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:46 AM
Declaration of Jaylon Tillman filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:45 AM
Declaration of Christopher Overton filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:43 AM
Second Declaration of Matt Mitchell filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:42 AM
Declaration of Matt Mitchell filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:41 AM
Second Declaration of Nyzier Fourqurean filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:40 AM
Declaration of Nyzier Fourqurean filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Declaration Wed 02/05 8:36 AM
Second Declaration of Michael P. Crooks filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean ISO re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EX L - LTR UW ATHLETICS
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
24 24 minutes Injunctive Hearing Tue 02/04 3:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Injunctive Hearing held on 2/4/2025 re2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction filed by Nyzier Fourqurean. [01:10] (Court Reporter PCH.) (jls)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Exhibit Tue 02/04 12:16 PM
Exhibit to3 Brief in Support filed by Nyzier Fourqurean Pavia v. NCAA 2024 WL 5159888 re:2 Motion for TRO (Crooks, Michael) Modified on 2/4/2025: Linked to the pending motion. (lak)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 9:06 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Max Steven Meckstroth for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Meckstroth, Max)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 8:43 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by David J Wenthold for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wenthold, David) Modified on 2/4/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Declaration Tue 02/04 8:27 AM
Declaration of Matthew Backus filed by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association re:2 Motion for TRO (Wenthold, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Backus CV,
Att: 2 Appendix B - Documents Considered
Monday, February 03, 2025
19 19 respm Response to Proposed Findings of Fact Mon 02/03 8:12 PM
Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association re:2 Motion for TRO and Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Declaration (not related to a motion) Mon 02/03 8:08 PM
Declaration of Kate E. Gehl re15 Brief in Opposition (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Fourqurean Article,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - June 2021 NIL Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Fourqurean Player Profile,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Lawsuit Article
17 17 misc Declaration (not related to a motion) Mon 02/03 8:03 PM
Declaration of Matthew Backus re15 Brief in Opposition (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Declaration (not related to a motion) Mon 02/03 8:01 PM
Declaration of Jerry Vaughn re15 Brief in Opposition (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - DI Manual (2024-2025),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - DII Manual (2024-2025)
15 15 respm Brief in Opposition Mon 02/03 5:42 PM
Brief in Opposition by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association re:2 Motion for TRO filed by Nyzier Fourqurean (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/03 5:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/03 5:18 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by David J Wenthold for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wenthold, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Certificate of Service Mon 02/03 5:04 PM
Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean as to 9 Text Only Order, 8 Text Only Order,. (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Timely Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2025.02.03 Email - Atty Gehl re NCAA Representation
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/03 4:48 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kate Gehl for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Gehl, Kate)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/03 4:45 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas L. Shriner, Jr for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Shriner, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Text Only Order Mon 02/03 3:43 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** By noon tomorrow, February 4, 2025, plaintiff is DIRECTED to provide certification to the court of what steps he took to provide "immediate notice" to defendant as required by the court's January 29, 2025, order. (Dkt. # 8 .) Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/3/2025. (rks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/30 9:47 AM
Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2025 at 02:00 PM as to2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction . (rks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 order Text Only Order Wed 01/29 4:36 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendant may have until February 3, 2025, to respond to the pending motion; the court will hold a hearing February 4, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide immediate notice to defendant. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 01/29/2025. (mfh)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 01/29 2:52 PM
Summons Issued as to National Collegiate Athletic Association. (jef)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Wed 01/29 2:28 PM
Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean as to3 Brief in Support,2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction ,5 Proposed Findings of Fact,4 Declaration,1 Complaint. (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 respm Proposed Findings of Fact Wed 01/29 2:27 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean re:2 Motion for TRO and Temporary Injunction . (Crooks, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 respm Declaration Wed 01/29 2:25 PM
Declaration of Michael P. Crooks filed by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean re:2 Motion for TRO. (Crooks, Michael) Modified on 1/29/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Decision and Waiver Application,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Coach Mitchell Statement from Waiver,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Nyzier Fourqurean Waiver Statements (2),
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Pavia Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - NIL-AT-3 - The Annual Opendorse Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - NCAA 2024-2025 Bylaws,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - ESPN UW Rosters,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - NCAA Constitution Preamble,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Articles Referenced,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - NCAA Mission Priorities,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Declarations in Support
3 3 respm Brief in Support Wed 01/29 2:17 PM
Brief in Support of2 Motion for TRO and Temporary Injunction by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean. (Crooks, Michael) Modified on 1/29/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 01/29 2:15 PM
Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction by Plaintiff Nyzier Fourqurean. (Crooks, Michael) Modified on 1/29/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/29 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT against National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3555812) , filed by Plaintiff, (Crooks, Michael) Modified on 1/29/2025: Corrected plaintiff. Deleted duplicate text. (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of NCAA Bylaws,
Att: 2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Wed 01/29 2:46 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor. (jef)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Wed 01/29 2:47 PM
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] ,[LINK:Preliminary Injunction Procedure] . (jef) Modified on 1/29/2025 (jef)
Related: [-]