Original Case: 3:25-cv-00068

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01187
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 3:05 AM CST
Defendant - Appellant
NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Thomas L. Shriner Jr.
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
David J. Wenthold
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
Max Steven Meckstroth
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
Kate E. Gehl
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NYZIER FOURQUREAN
Represented By
Michael Crooks
VON BRIESEN & ROPER, S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/11/2025 2:35 AM CST
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant National Collegiate Athletic Association by 02/14/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 02/21/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/19/2025 for National Collegiate Athletic Association. [1] [7433571] 25-1187 (PS) [Entered: 02/07/2025 02:31 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court