Original Case: 2:23-cv-02273

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01176
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
THOMAS LEONARD, III
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DANIEL E. ROLAND
Represented By
Michael B. Pullano
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Joseph F. Kampherstein III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM JUDGE
Represented By
Michael B. Pullano
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Joseph F. Kampherstein III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEVEN PARKINSON
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRIDGET GALLOWAY OWEN
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ENRICO PAGANELLI
Represented By
Paul C. Troy
Kane Pugh Knoell Troy & Kramer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID LADOV
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MELISSA BLANCO
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NICHOLAS PODUSLENKO
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MATHIEU SHAPIRO
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID A. NASATIR
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HILLARY J. MOONAY
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DEBBIE HUNTER
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROSANA CASTRO
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
FREDDA MADDOX
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DEB RYAN
Represented By
Michael B. Pullano
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Joseph F. Kampherstein III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRET M. BINDER
Represented By
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
URVE MAGGITTI
Represented By
Urve Maggitti
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/09/2025 5:11 AM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Urve Maggitti in District Court No. 2:23-cv-02273. (KR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Order 012825
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR)
Related: [-]
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by Michael Daley , Esq. or any other attorney from the Administrative Office of the Pennsylvania Courts, the designated filer shall be Bret M. Binder. (KR)
Related: [-]