Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11420

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:25-ap-01006
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jefferson Capital Systems
200 14th Ave E
Sartell, MN 56377
Represented By
Jefferson Capital Systems
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa
1018 Washburn Dr
Leander, TX 78641
Represented By
Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Saturday, April 26, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/26 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):13 Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Whitney L White for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems. ) Hearing Scheduled For 6/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 ... Five calendar days before the hearing, exhibits must be: (1) mailed to U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Attn: Jennifer Lopez, Homer Thornberry Judicial Bldg., 903 San Jacinto, Suite 322, Austin, TX 78701 and (2) emailed to Adam Schmit at Adam_Schmit@txwb.uscourts.gov, Juliana Steward at Juliana_Steward@txwb.uscourts.gov AND Jennifer Lopez at jennifer_lopez@txwb.uscourts.gov.... If the parties anticipate that 30 minutes is not enough time for all sides to present argument and evidence for their matter, the parties must file a motion requesting a special setting.
Thursday, April 24, 2025
14 14 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Thu 04/24 1:24 PM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 6/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 ... Five calendar days before the hearing, exhibits must be: (1) mailed to U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Attn: Jennifer Lopez, Homer Thornberry Judicial Bldg., 903 San Jacinto, Suite 322, Austin, TX 78701 and (2) emailed to Adam Schmit at Adam_Schmit@txwb.uscourts.gov, Juliana Steward at Juliana_Steward@txwb.uscourts.gov AND Jennifer Lopez at jennifer_lopez@txwb.uscourts.gov.... If the parties anticipate that 30 minutes is not enough time for all sides to present argument and evidence for their matter, the parties must file a motion requesting a special setting. (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Whitney L White for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems.
Monday, March 31, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Case (Adversary) Mon 03/31 11:49 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Whitney L White for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems. (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 03/12 10:19 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Whitney L White for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 03/11 1:14 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Plaintiff Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
10 10 ans Response (Adversary) Tue 02/25 11:49 AM
Response Filed by Plaintiff Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa. (Schoener, Lauren) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint, Filed by Whitney L White for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Mon 02/24 2:28 PM
Jefferson Capital Systems answer deadline updated to 3/31/2025 (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/23 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Allowing Extension of Time to Respond, Date Extended to 03/31/2025 (related document(s):4 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint, Filed by Whitney L White for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) ,. (Order entered on 2/21/2025)
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/21 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 2/19/2025)
7 7 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Fri 02/21 10:19 AM
Order Allowing Extension of Time to Respond, Date Extended to 03/31/2025 Related [+] ,. (Order entered on 2/21/2025) (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint, Filed by Whitney L White for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Wed 02/19 9:17 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 2/19/2025) (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
5 5 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 02/18 10:50 AM
Notice of Vacation filed by Whitney L White for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Tue 02/18 10:47 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint, Filed by Whitney L White for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems. (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 02/11 10:08 AM
Summons Served on Jefferson Capital Systems - served on 2/6/2025 (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 02/07 9:11 AM
Complaint filed by Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa against Jefferson Capital Systems (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
1 1 court Summons Issued (Auto) Thu 02/06 8:41 AM
Summons Issued on Jefferson Capital Systems Answer Due 03/10/2025 (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]