District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:25-cv-00412
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025
Case in other court:USCA, 25-05037 USCA, 25-05055
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 5:58 AM EDT
Amicus
CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER
Represented By
Brianne Jenna Gorod
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa, I
Office Of The Attorney General/fl
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office Of The Attorney General/fl
contact info
David Costello
Florida Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Darrick Monson
Florida Attorney Generals Office
contact info
Amicus
STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By
Whitney D. Hermandorfer
Office Of Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Office Of The Attorney General & Reporter- Tn
contact info
Defendant
SCOTT BESSENT
Represented By
Madeline McMahon
Doj-Civ
contact info
Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
SERGIO GOR
Represented By
Madeline McMahon
Doj-Civ
contact info
Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
HENRY J. KERNER
Represented By
Madeline McMahon
Doj-Civ
contact info
Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By
Madeline McMahon
Doj-Civ
contact info
Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
TRENT MORSE
Washington, DC 20500
Represented By
Madeline McMahon
Doj-Civ
contact info
Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
RUSSELL T. VOUGHT
Represented By
Madeline McMahon
Doj-Civ
contact info
Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
CATHY A. HARRIS
in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Member of the Merit Systems Protection Board 1615 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20419
Represented By
Ezra Louvis
Milbank LLP
contact info
Kerrie Diane Riggs
Kator, Parks, Weiser & Harris, PLLC
contact info
Jeremy D. Wright
Kator, Parks, Weiser & Wright PLLC
contact info
Neal Kumar Katyal
Milbank LLP
contact info
Michael J. Kator
Kator, Parks, Weiser & Wright, PLLC
contact info
Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky
Milbank LLP
contact info
Linda Marie Correia
Correia & Puth, PLLC
contact info

GPO Feb 18 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/18/2025. (lcrc3)
GPO Mar 04 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting declaratory and injunctive relief. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/4/2025. (lcrc3)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
47 47 misc Transcript Thu 03/20 12:31 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on 3-3-25; Page Numbers: 1-24; Date of Issuance: 3-20-25; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone Number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/10/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2025.(Miller, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
45 45 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 03/05 10:15 AM
ORDER denying42 Motion to Stay Order Pending Appeal. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
46 46 misc Amicus Brief Wed 03/05 1:42 PM
AMICUS BRIEF by CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER. (mg)
Related: [-]
44 44 respm Response to motion Tue 03/04 6:28 PM
RESPONSE re42 MOTION to Stay Court's Order Pending Appeal filed by CATHY A. HARRIS. (Wright, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
43 43 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 03/04 4:46 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re41 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (zjm) (Main Document 43 replaced on 3/4/2025) (zjm).
Related: [-]
42 42 5 pgs motion Stay Tue 03/04 4:35 PM
MOTION to Stay Court's Order Pending Appeal by SCOTT BESSENT, TRENT MORSE, SERGIO GOR, HENRY J. KERNER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT. (Newman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
41 41 2 pgs appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Tue 03/04 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to39 Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Judgment, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus,40 Memorandum & Opinion by SCOTT BESSENT, TRENT MORSE, SERGIO GOR, HENRY J. KERNER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Newman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
40 40 35 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 03/04 11:39 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting22 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting declaratory and injunctive relief. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/4/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus Tue 03/04 11:36 AM
ORDER granting22 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting declaratory and injunctive relief. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/4/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 03/04 11:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting23 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that the brief is DEEMED FILED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/4/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 03/07 1:21 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5055 for41 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by RUSSELL T. VOUGHT, DONALD J. TRUMP, SERGIO GOR, HENRY J. KERNER, TRENT MORSE, SCOTT BESSENT. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
minutes Preliminary Injunction Mon 03/03 5:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction22 held on 3/3/2025. Oral argument heard, and the court takes the motion under advisement. (Court Reporter: Tim Miller) (tj)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
38 38 respm Reply to opposition to motion Sun 03/02 3:42 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Motion for Judgment,, Motion for Permanent Injunction,, Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion for Writ of Mandamus,, Motion for Declaratory Judgment, filed by CATHY A. HARRIS. (Wright, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 01, 2025
37 37 misc Amicus Brief Sat 03/01 8:51 AM
AMICUS BRIEF by STATE OF TENNESSEE. (Hermandorfer, Whitney)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 03/01 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Fiorile on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE (Fiorile, Joseph)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 03/01 8:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney D. Hermandorfer on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE (Hermandorfer, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
34 34 misc Amicus Brief Fri 02/28 5:52 PM
AMICUS BRIEF by STATE OF FLORIDA. (DeSousa, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
33 33 30+ pgs respm Response to motion Fri 02/28 4:56 PM
RESPONSE re22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Writ of Mandamus MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by SCOTT BESSENT, TRENT MORSE, SERGIO GOR, HENRY J. KERNER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT. (Newman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Costello on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (Costello, David)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Darrick Monson on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (Monson, Darrick)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Andrew Forrester on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (Forrester, Nathan)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Paul DeSousa, I on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (DeSousa, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 02/27 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Madeline M. McMahon (Newman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
27 27 misc Transcript Wed 02/26 12:23 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF TRO HEARING before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on 2-13-25; Page Numbers: 1-19; Date of Issuance: 2-26-25; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone Number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2025.(Miller, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/25 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Kumar Katyal on behalf of CATHY A. HARRIS (Katyal, Neal)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra Louvis on behalf of CATHY A. HARRIS (Louvis, Ezra)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky on behalf of CATHY A. HARRIS (Zelinsky, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Leave to File Document Mon 02/24 1:11 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER.(Gorod, Brianne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/24 10:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting19 ,20 ,21 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Neal K. Katyal, Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky, and Ezra P. Louvis are admitted to represent Plaintiff Cathy A. Harris pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.6(a). Click for instructions . SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/24/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
22 22 50 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction Judgment Permanent Injunction Summary Judgment Writ of Mandamus Declaratory Judgment Sun 02/23 10:40 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Judgment , MOTION for Permanent Injunction , MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION for Writ of Mandamus , MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by CATHY A. HARRIS.(Wright, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 12 pgs Statement of Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Cathy A. Harris,
Att: 4 Exhibit Termination Email
Saturday, February 22, 2025
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Sat 02/22 10:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ezra Louvis, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11497773. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CATHY A. HARRIS.(Riggs, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Ezra Louvis,
Att: 2 Exhibit Louvis Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Sat 02/22 10:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11497772. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CATHY A. HARRIS.(Riggs, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky,
Att: 2 Exhibit Zelinsky Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Sat 02/22 10:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Neal Kumar Katyal, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11497771. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CATHY A. HARRIS.(Riggs, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Neal Kumar Katyal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Katyal Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, February 20, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 02/20 4:26 PM
ORDER denying16 Motion to Stay Temporary Restraining Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/20/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response to motion Thu 02/20 2:28 PM
RESPONSE re16 MOTION to Stay re8 Order on Motion for TRO Pending Appeal filed by CATHY A. HARRIS. (Wright, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Stay Thu 02/20 12:27 PM
MOTION to Stay re8 Order on Motion for TRO Pending Appeal by SCOTT BESSENT, TRENT MORSE, SERGIO GOR, HENRY J. KERNER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT. (McMahon, Madeline)
Related: [-]
15 15 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 02/20 11:22 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (mg)
Related: [-]
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Thu 02/20 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to8 Order on Motion for TRO by SCOTT BESSENT, TRENT MORSE, SERGIO GOR, HENRY J. KERNER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (McMahon, Madeline) Modified event on 2/20/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 02/21 11:33 AM
USCA Case Number 25-5037 for14 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by RUSSELL T. VOUGHT, DONALD J. TRUMP, SERGIO GOR, HENRY J. KERNER, TRENT MORSE, SCOTT BESSENT. (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
13 13 2 pgs misc Status Report Wed 02/19 4:09 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by CATHY A. HARRIS, SCOTT BESSENT, TRENT MORSE, SERGIO GOR, HENRY J. KERNER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT. (Wright, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy D. Wright on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wright, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/19 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Jeremy D. Wright is admitted to represent Plaintiff Cathy A. Harris pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.6(a). Click for instructions . SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/19/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/19 2:04 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 2/23/2025. Responses due by 2/28/2025 Replies due by 3/2/2025. Status Report due by 2/19/2025 Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 23A- In Person before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
11 11 misc Errata Tue 02/18 8:47 PM
ERRATA Submission of Certificate of Good Standing by CATHY A. HARRIS re10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (Riggs, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/18 3:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeremy Wright, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11486595. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CATHY A. HARRIS.(Riggs, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of J.Wright,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
9 9 21 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 02/18 3:37 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/18/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Tue 02/18 3:35 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/18/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 02/18 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Name- Jeremy Wright. The following error(s) need correction: Pro Hac Vice motion must be accompanied by a Certificate of Good Standing issued within the last 30 days (LCvR 83.2(c)(2)). Please file certificate as an Errata. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 02/14 9:43 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re2 Motion for TRO filed by CATHY A. HARRIS.(Riggs, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit B
Thursday, February 13, 2025
6 6 14 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 02/13 11:00 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re2 Motion for TRO filed by SCOTT BESSENT, TRENT MORSE, SERGIO GOR, HENRY J. KERNER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT. (McMahon, Madeline)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline McMahon on behalf of All Defendants (McMahon, Madeline)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 02/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE: The Court will provide public access to the motion hearing in this matter now scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 3:00pm before the Hon. Rudolph Contreras. Members of the public shall adhere to the rules set forth on the Court's website. Toll Free Number: (833) 990-9400; Meeting ID 698780857. (tj)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 02/13 3:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2025 re2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by plaintiff CATHY A. HARRIS. Oral argument heard, and plaintiff shall file a reply to the government's opposition by 2/14/2025. The court takes the motion under advisement. (Court Reporter: Tim Miller) (tj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 02/12 8:56 AM
SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/12 8:48 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error Wed 02/12 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ,1 Complaint. Please note the following error for future filings: Invalid attorney signature- signature on document must match PACER login. Do not refile; future non-compliant documents may be entered in error. (znmw)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 02/12 11:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the matter on February 13, 2025, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with a copy of this order immediately upon receipt. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/12/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/12 12:33 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2025 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 23A- In Person before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/11 11:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Marie Correia on behalf of CATHY A. HARRIS (Correia, Linda)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 02/11 9:55 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by CATHY A. HARRIS.(Riggs, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Compliance Report,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 9:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11473515) filed by CATHY A. HARRIS.(Riggs, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Summons for Attorney General,
Att: 4 Summons Summons for Scott Bessent,
Att: 5 Summons Summons for Sergio Gor,
Att: 6 Summons Summons for Henry Kerner,
Att: 7 Summons Summons for Trent Morse,
Att: 8 Summons Summons for Donald Trump,
Att: 9 Summons Summons for USAO,
Att: 10 Summons Summons for Vought