Original Case: 1:25-cv-00412

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05037
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 11:18 AM EDT
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Indiana
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Texas
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Tennessee
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of South Carolina
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Oklahoma
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of North Dakota
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Nebraska
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Montana
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Missouri
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Mississippi
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Louisiana
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Kentucky
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Kansas
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Iowa
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Idaho
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Georgia
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Arkansas
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Alabama
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Florida
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of Utah
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
State of West Virginia
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Arizona Legislature
Represented By
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa I
Florida Attorney General's Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Florida
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Martin Akerman
Represented By
Martin Akerman
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Michigan
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Maine
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Maryland
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of California
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Illinois
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Delaware
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Lev Menand
Represented By
Steven A. Hirsch
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Connecticut
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Kathryn Judge
Represented By
Steven A. Hirsch
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Colorado
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Jeffrey N. Gordon
Represented By
Steven A. Hirsch
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Riley Keenan
Represented By
Joseph Marc Sellers
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Minnesota
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Nevada
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of New Jersey
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of New Mexico
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of New York
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of North Carolina
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Oregon
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Rhode Island
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Vermont
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Washington
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Wisconsin
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
District of Columbia
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Joseph P. Carson
Represented By
Joseph P. Carson
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Arizona
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Constitutional Accountability Center
Represented By
Elizabeth Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Brianne Jenna Gorod
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Brian Rene Frazelle
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Patrick Borchers
Represented By
Joseph Marc Sellers
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Michael C. Dorf
Represented By
Joseph Marc Sellers
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Kellen Funk
Represented By
Joseph Marc Sellers
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Aziz Zahirul Huq
Represented By
Joseph Marc Sellers
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Riley Kennan
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
James Pfander
Represented By
Joseph Marc Sellers
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
253 Members of Congress
Represented By
John M. Ugai
Farella Braun & Martel LLP
contact info
Anthony P. Schoenberg
Farella Braun & Martel LLP
contact info
Alexis Loeb
Farella Braun & Martel LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
James M. Eisenmann
Represented By
Kathryn Marshall Ali
Ali & Lockwood LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Lockwood
Ali & Lockwood LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Jonathan Shaub
Represented By
Joseph Marc Sellers
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Raymond Limon
Represented By
Kathryn Marshall Ali
Ali & Lockwood LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Lockwood
Ali & Lockwood LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Jessica Parks
Represented By
Kathryn Marshall Ali
Ali & Lockwood LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Lockwood
Ali & Lockwood LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Peter Conti-Brown
Represented By
William Bullock Pittard IV
Kaiser PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
State of Hawaii
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Government Accountability Project, Inc.
Represented By
Thad M. Guyer
T.M. Guyer & Friends, PC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
John C. Coates, IV
Represented By
Steven A. Hirsch
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Russell T. Vought, in his official capacity as Director of the Office of Management and Budget
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Mark Reiling Freeman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States of America
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Mark Reiling Freeman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Henry Kerner, in his official capacity as Acting Chairman of the Merit Systems Protection Board
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Mark Reiling Freeman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Sergio Gor, in his official capacity as Director of the White House Presidential Personnel Office
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Mark Reiling Freeman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Trent Morse, in his official capacity as Deputy Assistant to the President and Deputy Director of the White House Presidential Personnel Office
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Mark Reiling Freeman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Scott Bessent, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Movant-Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Martin Akerman
Represented By
Martin Akerman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Cathy A. Harris, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Member of the Merit Systems Protection Board
Represented By
Linda Marie Correia
Correia & Puth, PLLC
contact info
Neal Kumar Katyal
Milbank LLP
contact info
Kerrie Diane Riggs
Kator, Parks, Weiser & Wright, PLLC
contact info
Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky
Milbank LLP
contact info
Ezra Louvis
Milbank LLP
contact info
Jeremy D. Wright
Kator, Parks, Weiser & Wright, PLLC
contact info
Michael Kator
Kator, Parks, Weiser & Wright, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:18 AM EDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5037
Related: [-]
28 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2101744] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:25-cv-00412-RC filed by Scott Bessent, Sergio Gor, Henry Kerner, Trent Morse, Donald J. Trump and Russell T. Vought. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5037 25-5037
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2101746] filed directing the parties to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/24/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 03/24/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/24/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/24/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/24/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 03/24/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/24/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/24/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/07/2025. APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 03/24/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 03/24/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/24/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/07/2025. 25-5037
Related: [-]
1 pgs ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [2101795] filed by Neal Kumar Katyal and co-counsel Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky; Ezra P. Louvis on behalf of Appellee Cathy A. Harris. 25-5037 (Zelinsky, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
1 pgs ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [2101798] filed by Jeremy D. Wright on behalf of Appellee Cathy A. Harris. 25-5037 (Wright, Jeremy)
Related: [-]