New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lisa G Beckerman
Case #: 1:25-bk-10277
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025

Debtor
Splashlight Holding LLC
75 Varick Street
New York, NY 10013
Represented By
Gary M. Kushner
Goetz Fitzpatrick LLP
contact info
Clifford A. Katz
Goetz Platzer LLP
contact info
Scott D. Simon
Goetz Platzer LLP
contact info
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 3:27 PM EDT
Creditor
Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc.
1370 Broadway
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Jonathan N Helfat
Otterbourg P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Boathouse Capital II LP
Represented By
Christopher Harris
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Shawn Hansen
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Adam J. Goldberg
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Interested Party
Boathouse Capital III LP
Represented By
Christopher Harris
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Shawn Hansen
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Adam J. Goldberg
Latham & Watkins
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Andrea Beth Schwartz
Doj-Ust
contact info
Unknown
Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC
Represented By
Bruce J. Zabarauskas
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
76 76 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 05/20 3:39 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 Filed by Scott D. Simon on behalf of Splashlight Holding LLC. (Simon, Scott)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 17, 2025
75 75 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sun 05/18 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 05/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #73 )
Thursday, May 15, 2025
74 74 1 pgs misc Letter Thu 05/15 11:47 AM
Letter Related [+] Filed by Gary M. Kushner on behalf of Splashlight Holding LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (LGB) (Kushner, Gary)
Related: [-] 55 ,43 ,42 ,71 ,56
73 73 3 pgs order Scheduling Order (Will Generate PDF Notice to BNC) Thu 05/15 10:08 AM
Second Amended Order Signed On 5/15/2025 Re:(I) Scheduling Hearing On Motion To Dismiss And Motion For Adequate Protection, And (II) Setting Related Deadlines . with hearing to be held on 7/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (LGB) (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]