Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-10277

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lisa G Beckerman
Case #: 1:25-ap-01038
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
2 Bankruptcy - Other
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Boathouse Capital II LP
Represented By
Boathouse Capital II LP
contact info
Defendant
Boathouse Capital III LP
Represented By
Boathouse Capital III LP
contact info
Defendant
BOATHOUSE CAPITAL III MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By
BOATHOUSE CAPITAL III MANAGEMENT LLC
contact info
Defendant
CHONG MOUA
Represented By
CHONG MOUA
contact info
Defendant
Brian Cook
Represented By
Brian Cook
contact info
Plaintiff
Splashlight Holding LLC
75 Varick Street
New York, NY 10013
Represented By
Scott D. Simon
Goetz Platzer LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 04/09 2:21 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Brian Christopher Dunning on behalf of Splashlight Holding LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (LGB) (Dunning, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/09 2:14 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Brian Christopher Dunning on behalf of Splashlight Holding LLC. (Dunning, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 04/09 7:16 AM
So Ordered Joint Stipulation Signed On 4/9/2025. Re: To Extend The Deadline To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 04/04 12:33 PM
Stipulation (Joint) TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Filed by Shanice Dara Hinckson on behalf of Brian Cook. (Hinckson, Shanice)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice, Appearance Fri 04/04 12:29 PM
Notice of Appearance of Kevin R. Puvalowski filed by Shanice Dara Hinckson on behalf of Brian Cook. (Hinckson, Shanice)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
7 7 3 pgs order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 04/03 3:45 PM
Joint So Ordered Stipulation signed on 4/3/2025 Re: Extend The Deadline To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint . (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs notice Notice, Appearance Thu 04/03 3:07 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Shanice Dara Hinckson on behalf of Brian Cook. (Hinckson, Shanice)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation Thu 04/03 10:08 AM
Stipulation / Joint Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Christopher Harris on behalf of BOATHOUSE CAPITAL III MANAGEMENT LLC, Boathouse Capital II LP, Boathouse Capital III LP, CHONG MOUA. (Harris, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/12 11:38 AM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Scott D. Simon on behalf of Splashlight Holding LLC. (Simon, Scott)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/06 2:54 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Scott D. Simon on behalf of Splashlight Holding LLC. (Simon, Scott)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 03/05 2:53 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (LGB), Answer due by 4/4/2025, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 03/04 8:58 PM
Adversary case 25-01038 Complaint against Boathouse Capital II LP, Boathouse Capital III LP, BOATHOUSE CAPITAL III MANAGEMENT LLC, CHONG MOUA, Brian Cook (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (81 (Subordination of claim or interest)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Scott D. Simon on behalf of Splashlight Holding LLC. (Simon, Scott)
Related: [-]