Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11420

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:25-ap-01008
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Texan Credit Corporation
357 Jacob Street
Timpson, TX 75975
Represented By
Texan Credit Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa
1018 Washburn Dr
Leander, TX 78641
Represented By
Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/22 10:50 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jason Sansone for Defendant Texan Credit Corporation (Sansone, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/28 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/28/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Scheduling Order (related document(s):2 Complaint for Violation of Automatic Stay filed by Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa against Texan Credit Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00)) Docket Call Set For 7/23/2025 at 09:30 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 Discovery due 6/24/2025, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/16/2025, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/7/2025. (Order entered on 3/26/2025)
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
10 10 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Wed 03/26 10:28 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 7/23/2025 at 09:30 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 Discovery due 6/24/2025, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/16/2025, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/7/2025. (Order entered on 3/26/2025) (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint for Violation of Automatic Stay filed by Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa against Texan Credit Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00)
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/19 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 3/17/2025)
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 misc Statement Regarding Consent Mon 03/17 3:06 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Jason Sansone for Defendant Texan Credit Corporation (Sansone, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Mon 03/17 2:54 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 3/17/2025) (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 03/17 2:50 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Jason Sansone for Defendant Texan Credit Corporation. (Sansone, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/17 2:03 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Texan Credit Corporation, (Sansone, Jason)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request (Adversary) Mon 03/17 1:57 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jason Sansone for Defendant Texan Credit Corporation (Sansone, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Mon 02/24 1:27 PM
Summons Served on Texan Credit Corporation - served on 2/19/2025 (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 12:53 PM
Complaint for Violation of Automatic Stay filed by Joseph Stephen DePalma Hinojosa against Texan Credit Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]
1 1 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 02/18 8:21 AM
Summons Issued on Texan Credit Corporation Answer Due 03/20/2025 (Schoener, Lauren)
Related: [-]